This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2019 at 07:55:34 (UTC).

Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company v. Carolina Piping Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Carolina Piping Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Lindsey Meagher

Anita Wylds

Henry Wylds

Mary M. Meagher

Emma G. Meagher

Carolina Piping Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vonnetta L. Benjamin

Attorney at Womble, Bond, Dickinson (US) LLP

271 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

Defendant Attorneys

Victor Hawk

Attorney at Victor Hawk, PC

338 Telfair Street

Augusta, GA 30901

Harry D. Revell

Attorney at Nicholson Revell, LLP

4137 Columbia Rd.

Augusta, GA 30907

Adam William King

Attorney at Nicholson Revell, LLP

4137 Columbia Rd.

Augusta, GA 30907

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint by Emma G. Meagher, Lindsey Meagher, Mary M. Meagher.(Hawk, Victor) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Carolina Piping Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#15

(#15) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed March 15, 2019, for Mary M. Meagher Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#14

(#14) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed March 15, 2019, for Emma G. Meagher Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 3/4/2019 Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#12

(#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds. (Revell, Harry) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#11

(#11) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds. (Revell, Harry) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds.(Revell, Harry) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Henry Wylds served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Anita Wylds served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#6

(#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Carolina Piping Services, Inc., Emma G. Meagher, Lindsey Meagher, Mary M. Meagher, Anita Wylds, and Henry Wylds. (jlh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

2 #1

Blank Forms

#2

(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint from Superior Court of Richmond County, GA (2017RCCV00492)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against all Defendants, filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint from Superior Court of Richmond County, GA (2017RCCV00492), #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint from Richmond County, GA (2017RCSC1497), #3 Exhibit C - Endurance Insurance Policy, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Complaint by Emma G. Meagher, Lindsey Meagher, Mary M. Meagher.(Hawk, Victor) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Carolina Piping Services, Inc. answer due 5/18/2019. (maa) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Carolina Piping Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Emma G. Meagher answer due 4/5/2019; Mary M. Meagher answer due 4/5/2019. (maa) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed March 15, 2019, for Mary M. Meagher Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed March 15, 2019, for Emma G. Meagher Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Lindsey Meagher answer due 3/25/2019. (maa) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 3/4/2019 Acknowledgement filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds. (Revell, Harry) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds. (Revell, Harry) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Anita Wylds, Henry Wylds.(Revell, Harry) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Henry Wylds served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. Anita Wylds served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Benjamin, Vonnetta) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Carolina Piping Services, Inc., Emma G. Meagher, Lindsey Meagher, Mary M. Meagher, Anita Wylds, and Henry Wylds. (jlh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2541691. (jlh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against all Defendants, filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint from Superior Court of Richmond County, GA (2017RCCV00492), #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint from Richmond County, GA (2017RCSC1497), #3 Exhibit C - Endurance Insurance Policy, and #4 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.