This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2021 at 12:11:57 (UTC).

Eno v. Maplebear, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Eno filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Maplebear, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael L. Brown and Russell G. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03371

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Enco

Eric Eno

Defendant

Maplebear, Inc. doing business as Instacart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albert Joseph Bolet, III

Attorney at Goico & Bolet

Suite 200, 2021 North Druid Hills Road

Atlanta, GA 30329

Elizabeth K. Dorminey

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Steckel, Schneider & Stine, P.C.

Lenox Towers, Suite 400, 3400 Peachtree Road, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326-1107

Hipolito M. Goico

Attorney at Goico & Bolet, P.C.

2021 North Druid Hills Road, Ne, Suite 200

Atlanta, GA 30329-2145

James Larry Stine

Attorney at Wimberly Lawson Steckel Schneider & Stine, P.C.

3400 Peachtree Road, Ne, Suite 400 - Lenox Towers

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorneys

Philip L. Lu

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3424 Peachtree Road, Ne, Ste 1200

Atlanta, GA 30326-1127

Whitney M. Ferrer

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3424 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1200

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE reflecting service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Maplebear, Inc..(Lu, Philip) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#10

(#10) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Maplebear, Inc.. (Lu, Philip) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#9

(#9) Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/15/2021. (dob) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons by Eric Eno. (Stine, James) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Lu on behalf of Maplebear, Inc. (Lu, Philip) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by Maplebear, Inc.. (Lu, Philip) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Maplebear, Inc.. Discovery ends on 2/11/2022.(Ferrer, Whitney) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/14/2021)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit -9 - Email from Mark Killick

1 #8

Exhibit -8 - Notice of Termination

1 #7

Exhibit -7 -LOa -01/18

1 #6

Exhibit -6 -LOA -12/28

1 #5

Exhibit -5 -LOA -12/01

1 #4

Exhibit -4 -LOA -10/28

1 #3

Exhibit -3 -LOA -Request

1 #2

Exhibit -2 -Nall Memo re Reduction

1 #1

Exhibit -1 -Nall Lattice Notation

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Enco. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11195685) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Nall Lattice Notation, #2 Exhibit -2 -Nall Memo re Reduction, #3 Exhibit -3 -LOA -Request, #4 Exhibit -4 -LOA -10/28, #5 Exhibit -5 -LOA -12/01, #6 Exhibit -6 -LOA -12/28, #7 Exhibit -7 -LOa -01/18, #8 Exhibit -8 - Notice of Termination, #9 Exhibit -9 - Email from Mark Killick, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/19/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE reflecting service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Maplebear, Inc..(Lu, Philip) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Maplebear, Inc.. (Lu, Philip) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 9/15/2021. (dob) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons by Eric Eno. (Stine, James) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Lu on behalf of Maplebear, Inc. (Lu, Philip) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons by Maplebear, Inc.. (Lu, Philip) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Maplebear, Inc.. Discovery ends on 2/11/2022.(Ferrer, Whitney) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Eric Eno. Eric Eno served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Bolet, Albert) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (eop). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Mark H. Cohen recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-3371-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/19/2021. (dob) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Maplebear, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eric Enco. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11195685) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Nall Lattice Notation, #2 Exhibit -2 -Nall Memo re Reduction, #3 Exhibit -3 -LOA -Request, #4 Exhibit -4 -LOA -10/28, #5 Exhibit -5 -LOA -12/01, #6 Exhibit -6 -LOA -12/28, #7 Exhibit -7 -LOa -01/18, #8 Exhibit -8 - Notice of Termination, #9 Exhibit -9 - Email from Mark Killick, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAPLEBEAR INC is a litigant