This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:50:28 (UTC).

Enclade v. Crowley Marine Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Enclade filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Crowley Marine Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy B Vitter and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11201

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy B Vitter

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Archie Enclade

Defendant

Crowley Marine Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rhett Emerson King

Attorney at Strauss & King

406 Magazine Street, Suite 300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Berney Leopold Strauss

Attorney at Strauss & King

406 Magazine Street, Suite 300

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(jeg) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#3

(#3) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Crowley Marine Services, Inc. filed by Archie Enclade.(King, Rhett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Crowley Marine Services, Inc. (jeg) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#1

(#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT against Crowley Marine Services, Inc. (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Archie Enclade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Rhett Emerson King added to party Archie Enclade(pty:pla).(King, Rhett) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #2

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(jeg) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Crowley Marine Services, Inc. (jeg) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Crowley Marine Services, Inc. filed by Archie Enclade.(King, Rhett) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT against Crowley Marine Services, Inc. (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Archie Enclade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Rhett Emerson King added to party Archie Enclade(pty:pla).(King, Rhett) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.