This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:47:40 (UTC).

Enchanted IP LLC v. Anker Innovations Limited et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Enchanted IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Anker Innovations Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01632

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Enchanted IP LLC

Defendants

Fantasia Trading, LLC

Anker Technology Corporation

Anker Innovations Limited

Fantasia Trading, LLC doing business as Anker Direct

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Warren K. Mabey, Jr.

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Enchanted IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 25, 2019 - filed by Enchanted IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enchanted IP LLC. Anker Innovations Limited served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Anker Technology Corporation served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Fantasia Trading, LLC served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Enchanted IP LLC. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,194,871 B1. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Anker Innovations Limited, Anker Technology Corporation, Fantasia Trading, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2720856.) - filed by Enchanted IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketSet/Reset Answer Deadlines: Anker Innovations Limited answer due 1/23/2020; Anker Technology Corporation answer due 1/23/2020; Fantasia Trading, LLC answer due 1/23/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/25/2019. (dlw) Modified on 10/25/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 23, 2020 - filed by Enchanted IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 25, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Anker Innovations Limited answer due 10/25/2019; Anker Technology Corporation answer due 10/25/2019; Fantasia Trading, LLC answer due 10/25/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/26/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 25, 2019 - filed by Enchanted IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enchanted IP LLC. Anker Innovations Limited served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Anker Technology Corporation served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; Fantasia Trading, LLC served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Anker Innovations Limited on 9/3/2019; Anker Technology Corporation on 9/3/2019; Fantasia Trading, LLC on 9/3/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Enchanted IP LLC. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,194,871 B1. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Anker Innovations Limited, Anker Technology Corporation, Fantasia Trading, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2720856.) - filed by Enchanted IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anker Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ENCHANTED IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fantasia Trading LLC doing business as AnkerDirect is a litigant

Latest cases where Anker Innovations Limited is a litigant