This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 07:53:36 (UTC).

Emrit v. President of the United States et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Emrit filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against President of the United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-20095

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Satish Emrit

Sarasota, FL 34243

Defendants

United States Department of Commerce

President of the United States

Federal Trade Commission

International Trade Commission

United States Department of Agriculture

Florida Department of Children and Families

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (ebz) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

#4

(#4) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Federal Trade Commission, Florida Department of Children and Families, International Trade Commission, President of the United States, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Commerce. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • (#6) SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,,. US Mail returned for: Ronald Satish Emrit. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Mail returned for: Ronald Satish Emrit. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Closing Case per order on DE #4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (jao) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re: #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit. (ebz) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Federal Trade Commission, Florida Department of Children and Families, International Trade Commission, President of the United States, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Commerce. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.