This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2021 at 09:40:25 (UTC).

EMPSON v. REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 EMPSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tim A. Baker and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00405

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Empson

Defendants

REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LTD

REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD

ADIDIAS INDY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Kyle Dilley

Attorney at DILLEY & OAKLEY, P.C.

933 Keystone Way

Carmel, IN 46032

Defendant Attorneys

Craig M. Borowski

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Emily L. Connor

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Parties appeared by counsel on 4/21/2021, for a Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2022. Discovery due by 12/22/2021. Counsel shall contact the Magistrate Judge promptly after Plaintiff's deposition to provide an update on settlement and to discuss the timing of a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/21/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#14

(#14) Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant ADIDIAS INDY LLC . (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER - granting #11 Joint Motion to Correct Caption ; The the motion and ORDERS that the caption to all pleadings and filings in this matter shall read as indicated above. SO ORDERED. The Clerk is directed to terminate Reebok International, LTD and substitute adidias Indy LLC as the defendant of record. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/29/2021. (CKM) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/26/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order to Correct Caption

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption, filed by Defendant REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Correct Caption)(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Borowski on behalf of Defendant REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Borowski, Craig) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (REO) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to Patricia Empson. (Dilley, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff Patricia Empson. (Dilley, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Patricia Empson, filed by Patricia Empson. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6424167) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dilley, Daniel) Modified on 2/23/2021 (REO). (Entered: 02/22/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Parties appeared by counsel on 4/21/2021, for a Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2022. Discovery due by 12/22/2021. Counsel shall contact the Magistrate Judge promptly after Plaintiff's deposition to provide an update on settlement and to discuss the timing of a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/21/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant ADIDIAS INDY LLC . (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER - granting #11 Joint Motion to Correct Caption ; The the motion and ORDERS that the caption to all pleadings and filings in this matter shall read as indicated above. SO ORDERED. The Clerk is directed to terminate Reebok International, LTD and substitute adidias Indy LLC as the defendant of record. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/29/2021. (CKM) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/26/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption, filed by Defendant REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Correct Caption)(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Borowski on behalf of Defendant REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Borowski, Craig) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to REEBOK INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (REO) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to Patricia Empson. (Dilley, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff Patricia Empson. (Dilley, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kyle Dilley on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia Empson. (Dilley, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Patricia Empson, filed by Patricia Empson. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6424167) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dilley, Daniel) Modified on 2/23/2021 (REO). (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reebok International Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig M Borowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily L. Connor