This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/11/2019 at 07:13:48 (UTC).

Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds v. A&A Hauling, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Employers Laborers Locals 100 397 Pension, Health Welfare and Annuity Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against A A Hauling, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Beatty and Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00640

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark A. Beatty

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds

Defendants

A&A Hauling, Inc.

Steven R Petroff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chet A Kelly

Defendant Attorney

Thomas G. Maag

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #2

Exhibit

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

#4

3 #1

Consent Brochure

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Summons

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Stay AND COMPEL ARBITRATION by A&A Hauling, Inc.. (Maag, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Steven R Petroff. Responses due by 8/12/2019 (Maag, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Maag on behalf of All Defendants (Maag, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Steven R Petroff and original mailed to Attorney Kelly. (kdb) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to A&A Hauling, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Kelly. (kdb) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-640-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Chet A Kelly on behalf of Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3904231.), filed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less