This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2020 at 11:07:32 (UTC).

Employers And Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Employers And Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Joel Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07285

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

 

Party Details

Defendants

TORRENT PRIVATE LIMITED

EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY

RITE AID CORPORATION

HETERO USA INC.

MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

NUCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC

"John Doe" Wholesalers

CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Praxis Specialty Pharmacy, LLC

HETERO LABS LTD

TORRENT PHARMA INC.

PREFERRED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

MAJOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC

ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD

AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.

WALMART INC

H J HARKINS CO., INC.

A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC

MYLAN N.V.

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DAVID I. CATES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

216 West Pointe Drive, Suite A

Swansea, IL 62226

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00125. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to New Jersey. (lmb) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#5

(#5) PRELIMINARY CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19). Signed by Multidistrict Litigation Panel on 2/12/2020. (lmb) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Notice Of MDL Tag-Along) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cates, David) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Employers And Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund, Steamfitters Local 439. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-115-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/20/2020 (rah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Cates on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cates, David) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4102296.), filed by Steamfitters Local 439, Employers And Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cates, David) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from Illinois Southern on 6/15/20 per CTO-19 for MDL 2875(dd, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dd, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00125. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to New Jersey. (lmb) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRELIMINARY CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19). Signed by Multidistrict Litigation Panel on 2/12/2020. (lmb) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Notice Of MDL Tag-Along) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cates, David) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Employers And Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund, Steamfitters Local 439. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-115-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/20/2020 (rah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Cates on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cates, David) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4102296.), filed by Steamfitters Local 439, Employers And Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cates, David) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Major Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Torrent Private Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where PREFERRED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant