This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2021 at 06:56:06 (UTC).

Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis v. Jones et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Employees Retirement System of the City of St Louis filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Chelsey M. Vascura, Algenon L. Marbley and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04813

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Algenon L. Marbley

Referral Judges

Chelsey M. Vascura

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis

Defendants

Charles E Jones

James F O'Neil, III

Steven E. Strah

Steven J. Demetriou

FirstEnergy Corp.

Jerry Sue Thornton

James F. Pearson

Julia L. Johnson

Christopher D. Pappas

William T. Cottle

Leslie M Turner

George M. Smart

Donald T. Misheff

Robert Reffner

Justin Biltz

Michael J. Anderson

Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah

K. Jon Taylor

Paul T. Addison

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C Camillus

Attorney at MEYER WILSON CO., LPA

Po Box 141410

Columbus, OH 43214

Richard Stuart Wayne

Attorney at Strauss Troy

The Federal Reserve Building, 150 E Fourth Street, 4Th Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4018

Thomas Curry

Attorney at Saxena White P.A.

1000N West Street, Suite 12000

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert R Sparks

Attorney at Strauss Troy Co., LPA

150 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Lester Hooker

Attorney at Saxena White P.A.

7777 Glades Road, Suite 300

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Maya Saxena

Attorney at Saxena White P.A.

7777 Glades Road, Suite 300

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Defendant Attorneys

Carole Schwartz Rendon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Douglas L. Shively

Attorney at BakerHostetler LLP

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

F. Joseph Warin

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

William Scherman

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Christopher W.H. Sullivan

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Geoffrey J. Ritts

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave.

Cleveland, OH 44114

Marjorie P Duffy

325 John H. Mcconnell Blvd., Suite 600

Columbus, OH 43216

Robert Stephen Faxon

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave

Cleveland, OH 44114

Darrell Arthur Clay

Attorney at Walter & Haverfield LLP

1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114-1821

Ralph E Cascarilla

Attorney at Walter & Haverfield LLP

1301 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3500

Cleveland, OH 44114

Other Attorneys

John F McCaffrey

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

John A Favret, III

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

925 Euclid Ave., Suite 1150

Cleveland, OH 44115

Donald W Davis, Jr

Attorney at Brennan Manna & Diamond

75 East Market Street

Akron, OH 44308

Donnell C. Much

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

48 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

133 #1

Exhibit

133 #133

Main Document

#132

(#132) Response re #131 Notice (Other) to Plaintiffs' Notice of Further Developments Concerning the FirstEnergy Derivative Action Pending in the United States District Court, Northern District of Ohio by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Nitschke, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

131 #1

Exhibit

131 #131

Main Document

130 #1

Exhibit

130 #130

Main Document

#129

(#129) REPLY to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Nitschke, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan (mdr) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

4 #3

Exhibit Sullivan COGS

4 #2

Exhibit Scherman COGS

4 #1

Exhibit Warin COGS

#4

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan (mdr) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E Jones (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER transferring this case from the docket of the Honorable Douglas R. Cole to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 9/14/20. (sct) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7648051), filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sparks, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

181 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) NOTICE by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis re #132 Response (non motion), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) Response re #131 Notice (Other) to Plaintiffs' Notice of Further Developments Concerning the FirstEnergy Derivative Action Pending in the United States District Court, Northern District of Ohio by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Nitschke, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) NOTICE by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #130 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Molly Bowen. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/15/2021. (er) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8490957) of Molly Bowen by Consol Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) REPLY to Response to Motion re #120 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Nitschke, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, filed by Plaintiffs Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Consol Plaintiff Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Camillus, John) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. re #95 MOTION for Leave to File to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Notice Withdrawing Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.'s Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal (Nitschke, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) NOTATION ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sara DiLeo as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 28, 2021. (jlk) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants Paul T. Addison, Michael J. Anderson, William T. Cottle, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia L. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Robert Reffner, Luis A. Reyes, George M. Smart, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Jerry Sue Thornton, Leslie M Turner, Ebony Yeboah-Amankwah (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John A Favret, III for Defendant Michael J. Dowling (Favret, John) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John F McCaffrey for Defendant Michael J. Dowling (McCaffrey, John) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 10/6/2020. (mdr) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan (mdr) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of F. Joseph Warin, William S. Scherman and Christopher W.H. Sullivan by Defendant Charles E Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warin COGS, #2 Exhibit Scherman COGS, #3 Exhibit Sullivan COGS) (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E Jones (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase transferred in from Cincinnati Division, Case Number 1:20-cv-705. Case assigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (sct) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER transferring this case from the docket of the Honorable Douglas R. Cole to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 9/14/20. (sct) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7648051), filed by Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sparks, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FirstEnergy Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A Favret, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald W Davis, Jr