This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:08:46 (UTC).

Empire Community Development, LLC v. Maldonado et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Empire Community Development, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Maldonado. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary R. Brown, Joan M. Azrack and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06865

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

Referral Judges

Gary R. Brown

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Empire Community Development, LLC

Defendants

Elba Maldonado

Elba I. Maldonado

Capital One Bank USA NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan H Weinreb

Attorney at The Margolin and Weinreb Law Group, LLP

165 Eileen Way, Suite 101

Syosset, NY 11791

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Capital One Bank USA NA has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Capital One Bank USA NA is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#9

(#9) Request for Certificate of Default by Empire Community Development, LLC (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Community Development, LLC. Capital One Bank USA NA served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Community Development, LLC. Elba Maldonado served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020. (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank USA NA, Elba Maldonado. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Empire Community Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b by Empire Community Development, LLC (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Empire Community Development, LLC (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice

1 #1

Exhibit "A" through Exhibit "F"

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank USA NA, Elba Maldonado filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12129337 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Empire Community Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" through Exhibit "F", #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Capital One Bank USA NA has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Capital One Bank USA NA is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Certificate of Default by Empire Community Development, LLC (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Community Development, LLC. Capital One Bank USA NA served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Community Development, LLC. Elba Maldonado served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020. (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank USA NA, Elba Maldonado. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThis attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Empire Community Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b by Empire Community Development, LLC (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Empire Community Development, LLC (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank USA NA, Elba Maldonado filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12129337 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Empire Community Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" through Exhibit "F", #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.