Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/18/2021 at 15:41:21 (UTC).

Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated et al v. Google, LLC et al

Case Summary

On April 19, 2021, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated (“Emmerich Newspapers”), along with subsidiary companies (collectively, Plaintiffs), represented by Michael Jay Fuller, Jr. of Farrell & Fuller filed an antitrust action against Google LLC (“Google”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and compensatory damages for alleged anti competitive and monopolistic practices of the Defendant. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi with Judges Henry T. Wingate and LaKeysha Greer Isaac presiding.

 

In the complaint, the Emmerich Newspapers has alleged that “Google and Facebook, archrivals in the digital advertising market, conspired to further their worldwide dominance of the digital advertising market in a secret agreement codenamed “Jedi Blue.” The two archrivals, who are sometimes referenced as operating a duopoly in the market, unlawfully conspired to manipulate online auctions which generate digital advertising revenue. Facebook and Google agreed to avoid competing with another in September 2018. The quid pro quo was as follows—Facebook would largely forego its foray into header bidding and would instead bid through Google’s ad server. In exchange, Google agreed to give Facebook preferential treatment in its auctions.”

 

The Plaintiff has further alleged that “These actions are illegal and directly caused newspapers  across the country, including Plaintiffs, enormous financial harm in the form of loss of revenue sources. This is a per se violation of Section 1 of the Sherman Act, which declares ““[e]very . . .conspiracy, in restraint of trade or commerce among the several States” to be illegal. 15 U.S.C. § 1.” 

 

The Plaintiff has also alleged that “There is a direct causal connection between these antitrust violations and the harm to competition on the merits and to Plaintiffs. The harm was intentional and intended. The harm is of a type that Congress sought to redress in providing a private remedy for violations of the antitrust laws. The loss of revenue streams can be directly tied to the antitrust conduct of Defendants. Plaintiffs are direct victims of the alleged antitrust injury as a competitor in the digital advertising market. Damages can be quantified and apportioned among those directly and indirectly harmed.”

 

There are three counts for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs. The first count for relief is for alleged violation of Section 2 of the Sherman Act: 15 U.S.C. § 2 by Google’s Monopolization of the Digital Advertising Market on the ground that Google Wilfully Acquired and Maintained Its Monopoly Power of the Digital Advertising Market by Using Exclusionary Acts. The second count for relief is for alleged violation of Section 1 of the Sherman Act: 15 U.S.C. § 1 on the ground that Google and Facebook Conspired in Restraint of Trade. The third count for relief is for the alleged unjust enrichment by Google. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested the Court to declare that Defendants have violated the law and consequently the Plaintiffs are entitled to damages, treble damages, punitive damages, and/or restitution. The Plaintiff has further requested the Court to provide injunctive relief along with interests, costs and any other relief as the Court may deem just and equitable. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc.

Clarke Publishing, Inc.

Marion Publishing Company

Charleston Publishing Co., Inc.

Simpson Publishing Co., Inc.

Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated

Newton County Appeal Inc.

Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc.

Delta-Democrat Publishing Company

Louisville Publishing, Inc.

Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc.

Scott Publishing, Inc.

Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc.

Sunland Publishing Company, Inc.

J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc.

Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc.

Tallulah Publishing, Inc.

Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.

Defendants

Facebook, Inc.

Google, LLC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Jay Fuller, Jr.

Attorney at FARRELL & FULLER

1311 Ponce De Leon, Suite 202

San Juan, PR 00907

David W. Mitchell - PHV

Attorney at ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD, LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Steven M. Jodlowski - PHV

Attorney at ROBBINS GELLER RUDMAN & DOWD, LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Mitchell - PHV on behalf of Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. (Mitchell - PHV, David) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Jodlowski - PHV on behalf of Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. (Jodlowski - PHV, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit Exh A - COGs

#5

(#5) MOTION for Steven M. Jodlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4549658) by Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - COGs)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit Exh A - COGs

#4

(#4) MOTION for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4549614) by Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - COGs)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company. Google, LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC. (LAT) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4533847), filed by Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Mitchell - PHV on behalf of Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. (Mitchell - PHV, David) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Jodlowski - PHV on behalf of Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. (Jodlowski - PHV, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David W. Mitchell and Steven M. Jodlowski are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. in association with local counsel and upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/11/21 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Steven M. Jodlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4549658) by Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - COGs)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4549614) by Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - COGs)(Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company. Google, LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC. (LAT) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4533847), filed by Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven M Jodlowski