This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:47:20 (UTC).

Emmanuel Cathedral Church of God in Christ, Inc. v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Emmanuel Cathedral Church of God in Christ, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli and Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03004

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emmanuel Cathedral Church of God in Christ, Inc.

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Not Classified By Court

Peter J. Grilli

Tampa, FL 33609-3138

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley N. Ward-Singleton

Attorney at Jenkins Law P.L.

275 96Th Ave N Ste 5

St. Petersburg, FL 33702-2526

Nicholas J. Thompson

Attorney at Krapf Legal

2790 Sunset Point Rd.

Clearwater, FL 33759-1503

R. Donald Scruggs

Attorney at Jenkins Law PL

275 96Th Ave. N Suite 5

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

James Streeter Jenkins, III

Attorney at Jenkins Law P.L.

275 96Th Ave N Ste 5

St. Petersburg, FL 33702-2526

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Joseph Spahn, Jr.

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

111 North Orange Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801-2361

Lucie Ailene Robinson

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801-2361

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Peter John Grilli

Attorney at Peter J. Grilli, PA

3001 W Azeele St

Tampa, FL 33609-3138

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION to affirm decision , MOTION to withdraw reference by Emmanuel Cathedral Church of God in Christ, Inc. (Jenkins, James) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#14

(#14) First MOTION for James Jenkins, Esquire to withdraw as attorney by Emmanuel Cathedral Church of God in Christ, Inc. (Jenkins, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for March 17, 2020, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/3/2020. (MWS) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 3/17/2020 9:30 am before Peter Grilli. (Robinson, Lucie) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/26/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#8

(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the December 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 7/20/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/20/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Robinson, Lucie) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Robinson, Lucie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Robinson, Lucie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/9/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

State Court Other Documents

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

State Court ANSWER

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 13th Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 19-CA-8719 filed in State Court on 8/21/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16226446 filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spahn, Gary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to affirm decision , MOTION to withdraw reference by Emmanuel Cathedral Church of God in Christ, Inc. (Jenkins, James) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Nicholas J. Thompson and Ashley N. Ward-Singleton terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff and relieved of any further responsibility in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/6/2020. (REE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION for James Jenkins, Esquire to withdraw as attorney by Emmanuel Cathedral Church of God in Christ, Inc. (Jenkins, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#13) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. R. Donald Scruggs is not permitted to practice in the Middle District of Florida. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to show cause, in writing, why his appearance should not be stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(a). Counsel has until January 17, 2020, to comply with this Order. Failure to do so will result in counsel's appearance being stricken from the record without further notice from the Court. Further, upon review of the file, the Court finds that the named counsel has not registered for CM/ECF access. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to register for CM/ECF access by January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/3/2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/3/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for March 17, 2020, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/3/2020. (MWS) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 3/17/2020 9:30 am before Peter Grilli. (Robinson, Lucie) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/26/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #8), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/20/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the December 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 7/20/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/20/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Robinson, Lucie) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Robinson, Lucie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Robinson, Lucie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by December 20, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/9/2019. (MWS) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/9/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-3004-T-33AEP. (LRB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 13th Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 19-CA-8719 filed in State Court on 8/21/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16226446 filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spahn, Gary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less