This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2021 at 07:33:25 (UTC).

Eminger v. Menard, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Eminger filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Menard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Philip Calabrese. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01902

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Philip Calabrese

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Eminger

Defendant

Menard, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Drew T. Legando

Attorney at Merriman Legando Williams & Klang

1360 West 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorney

Gregory G. Guice

Attorney at Reminger Co. - Cleveland

1400 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Acknowledgement and Agreement to be Bound

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order: Case is assigned to the standard track. Not suitable for ADR at this time. The parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. The parties agree the Court should enter the protective order found in Appendix L to the Local Rules, which the Court will do by separate entry. The Court sets the following schedule: Initial disclosures due 11/3/2021; fact discovery deadline 3/15/2022. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 11/9/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Andrew Eminger. (Legando, Drew) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Menard, Inc.. (Guice, Gregory) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

3 #1

Rule 26 Report of Parties

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,MT) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures

1 #6

Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Production of Documents

1 #5

Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories

1 #4

Exhibit D - Affidavit of Defense Counsel

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Answer

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Docket

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketRule 502 Order [non-document]: Pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence, an inadvertent disclosure of a communication or information covered by the attorney-client privilege or work-product protection made in connection with this litigation shall not constitute a waiver of that privilege or protection in this or any other federal or state proceeding. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 11/9/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Protective Order. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement and Agreement to be Bound)(Y,A) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order: Case is assigned to the standard track. Not suitable for ADR at this time. The parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. The parties agree the Court should enter the protective order found in Appendix L to the Local Rules, which the Court will do by separate entry. The Court sets the following schedule: Initial disclosures due 11/3/2021; fact discovery deadline 3/15/2022. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 11/9/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. The Court held a Case Management Conference on 11/8/2021. Drew T. Legando, Ed Jerse, and Dylan Ford appeared for Plaintiff. Gregory G. Guice appeared for Defendant. The parties discussed the factual and procedural background of the case, and the Court assured itself that it has jurisdiction because the amount-in-controversy requirement is satisfied. Plaintiff does not intend to move to remand. The parties represented they do not intend to amend the pleadings or file motions directed to the pleadings. Plaintiff has requested his medical records, but has not yet received them. Defendant will make its initial disclosures, if it has not done so already. The parties indicated that they will consider whether mediation is appropriate after reviewing the medical records and completing Plaintiff's deposition. The Court sets a status conference on 1/10/2022 at 1:00 p.m. to be held by telephone. The Courtroom Deputy will provide dial-in instructions beforehand. Time: 30 minutes. (Y,A) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOrder [non-document]: The Court ORDERS the parties to bring information (other than Plaintiff's initial disclosure) to the case management conference establishing that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 10/21/2021. (Y,A) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Andrew Eminger. (Legando, Drew) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Menard, Inc.. (Guice, Gregory) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 11/8/2021 at 4:00 p.m. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties) (Y,A) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that Menard, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,MT) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,MT) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,MT) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketJudge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (M,MT) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Lake County Common Pleas Court, case number 21CV000699 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number AOHNDC-11074486. Filed by Menard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Defense Counsel, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Guice, Gregory) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Menard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory G. Guice