This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2019 at 08:22:59 (UTC).

Emiabata et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 a Property - Personal Property Fraud case was filed by Emiabata against Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01507

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Philip Emiabata

Naugatuck, CT 06770

Sylvia Emiabata

Defendants

Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., N.A.

Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP

Avail I. LLC

Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

JP Chase Bank

Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank

Specialized Loan Servicing

Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Shelley Hopkins

Attorney at Hopkins LAW, PLLC

3809 Juniper Trace, Suite 101

Austin, TX 78738

Mark Hopkins

Attorney at Hopkins LAW, PLLC

3809 Juniper Trace, Suite 101

Austin, TX 78738

Brian D. Rich

Attorney at Halloran & Sage

One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark D. Hopkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5478189) by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP.Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Hopkins, Shelley) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #1

copy of envelope

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2019 Discovery due by 3/26/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2020 Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

17 #1

Exhibit A

#3

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Hopkins on behalf of Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP (Hopkins, Mark) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Attorney(s) Shelley Hopkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5478216) by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT/TEMPORARY INJUNCTION against Avail I. LLC, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., N.A., Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, JP Chase Bank, Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Specialized Loan Servicing, filed by Philip Emiabata. (Oliver, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

25 #1

Exhibit

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Hopkins on behalf of Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP (Hopkins, Shelley) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

16 #2

Exhibit B

#25

(#25) NOTICE by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP re #23 MOTION to Dismiss , #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hopkins, Shelley) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit A

#24

(#24) Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Hopkins, Shelley) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

17 #2

Exhibit B

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP re #23 MOTION to Dismiss , #24 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hopkins, Shelley) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Hopkins, Shelley) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Dismiss by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP.Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Hopkins, Shelley) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Hopkins on behalf of Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP (Hopkins, Shelley) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Hopkins on behalf of Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP (Hopkins, Mark) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • (#20) ORDER. The Plaintiff's mail has been returned to the Court as undeliverable. It has come to the Court's attention that the Plaintiff has provided different addresses to the Court in his two open cases. See Emiabata v. Seton Healthcare Family, et al., No. 3:18-cv-02057 (D. Conn.) (filed 12/14/2018). The Plaintiff is directed to file a Notice of Change of Address forthwith. If the Plaintiff wishes to receive electronic notices in this matter, he is directed to file a consent to receive electronic notice of filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of the appropriate consent form to the Plaintiff together with this Order to both addresses of record. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/11/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Hopkins ; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Shelley Hopkins. Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Attorney(s) Shelley Hopkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5478216) by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark D. Hopkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5478189) by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Specialized Loan Servicing. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to JP Chase Bank. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Avail I. LLC, Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket Entry Correction re #3 Protective Order MODIFIED TO NOTE ENTRY HAS BEEN ENTERED IN ERROR AND REDOCKETED AS DOC #4; USED THE INCORRECT JUDGE'S ORDER (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.) Modified on 9/26/2019 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2019 Discovery due by 3/26/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2020 Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Filing fee received from Philip Emiabata: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXB00010595 (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT/TEMPORARY INJUNCTION against Avail I. LLC, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., N.A., Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, LLP, JP Chase Bank, Morgan Chase Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Specialized Loan Servicing, filed by Philip Emiabata. (Oliver, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.