This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:33:30 (UTC).

Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. v. Emerson Creek Events, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Emerson Creek Events, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Norman K. Moon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Norman K. Moon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.

Defendants

Emerson Creek Events, Inc.

Christina Demiduk

Countryview Pottery Co.

David Demiduk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry Irving Willett, III

Attorney at Christian and Barton, LLP

909 East Main Street, Suite 1200

Richmond, VA 23219-3095

Garfield Bernard Goodrum

Attorney at Garfield Goodrum, Design Law

90 Canal Street, 4Th Floor

Boston, MA 02114

Defendant Attorney

Lawrence E. Laubscher, Jr.

Attorney at Laubscher & Laubscher, PC

1160 Spa Road, Suite 2B

Annapolis, MD 21403

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. All Defendants.(Willett, Henry)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence E. Laubscher, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Laubscher, Lawrence)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Garfield Goodrum for Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. added Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/24/2020. (al)

#5

(#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Trademark by the Clerk (dg)

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Affidavit

#4

(#4) MOTION for Garfield Goodrum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3466163. by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Willett, Henry)

3 #3

Summons Issued David Demiduk

3 #2

Summons Issued Christina Demiduk

3 #1

Summons Issued Emerson Creek Events

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Countryview Pottery Co., Christina Demiduk, David Demiduk, Emerson Creek Events, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Emerson Creek Events, #2 Summons Issued Christina Demiduk, #3 Summons Issued David Demiduk)(dg)

#2

(#2) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. (dg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Countryview Pottery Co., Christina Demiduk, David Demiduk, Emerson Creek Events, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. Receipt number 0423-3465377.), filed by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. All Defendants.(Willett, Henry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence E. Laubscher, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Laubscher, Lawrence)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Garfield Goodrum for Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. added Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/24/2020. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#6) Oral ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Dkt. 4 for Garfield Goodrum to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 8/21/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Trademark by the Clerk (dg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Garfield Goodrum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3466163. by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Willett, Henry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Countryview Pottery Co., Christina Demiduk, David Demiduk, Emerson Creek Events, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Emerson Creek Events, #2 Summons Issued Christina Demiduk, #3 Summons Issued David Demiduk)(dg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc. (dg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Countryview Pottery Co., Christina Demiduk, David Demiduk, Emerson Creek Events, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. Receipt number 0423-3465377.), filed by Emerson Creek Pottery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less