This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2023 at 06:09:41 (UTC).

EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC v. Cellco Partnership

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cellco Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC

Consolidated Defendant

T-Mobile US, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alison Aubry Richards

Claire Abernathy Henry

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Robert William Weber

David E Finkelson

Corinne Stone Hockman

 

Court Documents

#65

(#65) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#64

(#64) ORDER granting #63 Stipulation of Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES that all claims and causes of action asserted in Member Case No. 2:22-cv- 00269-JRG by and between the Parties are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/6/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

63 #1

Proposed Order

#63

(#63) STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#62

(#62) FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #61 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/24/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

61 #2

Proposed Order

61 #1

Proposed Amended Docket Control Order

#61

(#61) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #40 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Scheduling Order,, Docket Control Order by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Docket Control Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#40

(#61) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #40 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Scheduling Order,, Docket Control Order by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Docket Control Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#8

(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. Verizon Communications Inc. served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Communications Inc. c/o C T CORPORATION SYSTEM. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC of Related Cases (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ORDER granting #63 Stipulation of Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES that all claims and causes of action asserted in Member Case No. 2:22-cv- 00269-JRG by and between the Parties are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/6/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #61 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/24/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #40 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Scheduling Order,, Docket Control Order by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Docket Control Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE by United States of America STATEMENT OF INTEREST (Sternhell, Philip) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by T-Mobile US, Inc. (Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-1) (Finkelson, David) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER re #57 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC, Cellco Partnership terminated., Attorney Michael E Jones; Alexandra Lane; Brian H Pandya; Kevin Paul Anderson and Shaun William Hassett terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/27/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) regarding Defendant Cellco Partnership, d/b/a Verizon Wireless by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER - AT&T Mobility LLC (Consolidated Civil Action 2:22cv268) terminated., Attorney Matthew Sean Yungwirth; Deron R Dacus and Brian H Pandya terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/24/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. Verizon Communications Inc. served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Communications Inc. c/o C T CORPORATION SYSTEM. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC of Related Cases (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Verizon Communications Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9026880.), filed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less