This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2022 at 07:24:02 (UTC).

Emergency Alerts Innovations, LLC v. United States Cellular Corp.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 Emergency Alerts Innovations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against United States Cellular Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03738

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC

Defendant

United States Cellular Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Irwin Park

David Powers Berten

Alison Aubry Richards

Defendant Attorneys

Paul E. Veith

Douglas I. Lewis

John Weatherby McBride

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice and without fees and costs to any party. Telephone status hearing set for 9/20/2022 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emergency Alerts Innovations, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 9/16/2022. No appearance necessary on 8/15/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Cellular Corp. by Douglas I. Lewis (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United States Cellular Corp. (McBride, John) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Motion by John Weatherby McBride for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/15/2022 at 10:00 AM. (McBride, John) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION by Defendant United States Cellular Corp. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (McBride, John) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Cellular Corp. by John Weatherby McBride (McBride, John) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Cellular Corp. by Paul E. Veith (Veith, Paul) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#8

(#8) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent by Emergency Alerts Innovations, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#7

(#7) MAILED Patent request letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 9/20/2022 at 9:00 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC by David Powers Berten (Berten, David) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Related Cases by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Claims Involving Patents by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed without prejudice and without fees and costs to any party. Telephone status hearing set for 9/20/2022 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emergency Alerts Innovations, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 9/16/2022. No appearance necessary on 8/15/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Cellular Corp. by Douglas I. Lewis (Lewis, Douglas) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United States Cellular Corp. (McBride, John) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion by John Weatherby McBride for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/15/2022 at 10:00 AM. (McBride, John) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Defendant United States Cellular Corp. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (McBride, John) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Cellular Corp. by John Weatherby McBride (McBride, John) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Cellular Corp. by Paul E. Veith (Veith, Paul) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emergency Alerts Innovations, LLC as to United States Cellular Corp. on 7/29/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent by Emergency Alerts Innovations, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Patent request letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 9/20/2022 at 9:00 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ey, ) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ey, ) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC by David Powers Berten (Berten, David) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Related Cases by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Claims Involving Patents by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19664681. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less