This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2023 at 06:09:25 (UTC).

EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC

Defendant

AT&T Mobility LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alison Aubry Richards

Defendant Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Matthew Sean Yungwirth

Brian H Pandya

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#25

(#25) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/24/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

(#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#23

(#23) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00270. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial., Cases associated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/21/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

#8

(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. AT&T Inc. served on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc. c/o CT CORPORATION SYSTEM. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC of Related Cases (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/24/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:22-cv-00270. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial., Cases associated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/21/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REDACTION to #16 Sealed Document by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian H Pandya on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Pandya, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. AT&T Inc. served on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc. c/o CT CORPORATION SYSTEM. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC of Related Cases (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTXEDC-9026742.), filed by EMERGENCY ALERTS INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Alison) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less