This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 07:20:36 (UTC).

Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michelle L. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01656

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michelle L. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners

Defendants

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Public Service Insurance Company

Public Service Mutual Insurance Company

Doe Insurance Companies 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cortney Feniello

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

16400 Southcenter Pkwy Ste 410

Tukwila, WA 98188

Jerry H. Stein

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

16400 Southcenter Pkwy Ste 410

Tukwila, WA 98188

Justin D Sudweeks

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

16400 Southcenter Pkwy Ste 410

Tukwila, WA 98188

Daniel Stein

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

16400 Southcenter Pkwy Ste 410

Tukwila, WA 98188

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7784660), filed by Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Public Service Insurance Company, Public Service Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MJV) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #3

Summons

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, United States Magistrate Judge; Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended corporate disclosure statement, complying with LCR 7.1(b), by December 7, 2022. (TF) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#5

(#5) AMENDMENT to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Hon. Michelle L. Peterson: Consistent with the recent amendment of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, existing parties or intervenors are DIRECTED to file disclosure statements that state the names and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to each party or intervenor if not previously disclosed within ten (10) days of this Order. New parties or proposed intervenors who join this case going forward are DIRECTED to file such a disclosure upon their first appearance or pleading.(TF) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDMENT to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, United States Magistrate Judge; Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended corporate disclosure statement, complying with LCR 7.1(b), by December 7, 2022. (TF) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/28/2022. (CDA) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Public Service Insurance Company, Public Service Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MJV) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketHon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (MJV) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7784660), filed by Emerald Crest Association of Apartment Owners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Public Service Company of Colorado is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortney Feniello