This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2021 at 07:11:50 (UTC).

EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP. v. MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03050

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

MARTHA GUARNIERI

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

3000 Two Logan Sq, 18Th & Arch Sts

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEFFREY A. CARR

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

301 Carnegie Center, Suite 400

Princeton, NJ 08543-5276

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

EMILY A. CATHCART

Attorney at MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER LLP

1617 John F Kennedy Blvd Suite 1500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MATTHEW A. LIPMAN

Attorney at MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER

1617 John F. Kennedy Blvd, Suite 1500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Dismiss filed by EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.. (CARR, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, 10/27/21, IS CONTINUED PENDING RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/26/21. 10/26/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

#9

8 #1

Exhibits A-E

8 #8

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Dismiss filed by EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.. (CARR, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, 10/27/21, IS CONTINUED PENDING RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/26/21. 10/26/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.. (CARR, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIPMAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.'S #9 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO PLACE UNDER SEAL THE EXHIBITS A,B,D, AND E TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 10/4/21.10/4/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXHIBITS A, B, D AND E by EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(md, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2021: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document) (md, ). (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Seal Exhibits filed by EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP..Certificate of Service.(CARR, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , MOTION to Dismiss filed by EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(CARR, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR WEDNESDAY, 10/27/21 AT 3:30 PM, TO BE CONDUCTED BY TELEPHONE, BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH.(fdc) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY A. CATHCART on behalf of MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC (CATHCART, EMILY) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC.(LIPMAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP. by MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC.(LIPMAN, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.. MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC waiver sent on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (CARR, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MARTHA GUARNIERI on behalf of EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP. (GUARNIERI, MARTHA) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC. Forwarded To: Jeffrey A. Carr on 7/9/21 (fdc, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MARQUE OF BRANDS AMERICAS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15241875.), filed by EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(CARR, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew A Lipman