This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:51:32 (UTC).

Emanuel v. Warden, FCC Coleman

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Emanuel filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden, FCC Coleman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Timothy Emanuel

Coleman, FL 33521

Respondent

Warden, FCC Coleman

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Exhibit Petition

#2

(#2) ORDER to respond to habeas petition and notice to petitioner. Petitioner has 45 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(CRR) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by Timothy Emanuel. (No fees paid, no service copies provided)(HAQ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER to respond to habeas petition and notice to petitioner. Petitioner has 45 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(CRR) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • FEES paid by Timothy Emanuel (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number Oca-10301) (HAI) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by Timothy Emanuel. (No fees paid, no service copies provided)(HAQ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less