This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2022 at 10:09:04 (UTC).

Ely v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 Ely filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bert W. Milling, Jr, Kristi K. DuBose and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristi K. DuBose

Referral Judges

Bert W. Milling, Jr

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donavette Ely

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook Holdings, LLC

Facebook Operations, LLC

Facebook Payments, Inc.

Facebook Technologies, LLC

Instagram, LLC.

Siculus, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clinton Richardson

Attorney at Beasley Allen

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Michael M. Weinkowitz

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadephia, PA 19106

Defendant Attorney

M. Warren Butler

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie LLP

P. O. Box 1548

Mobile, AL 36633-1548

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3034652, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Donavette Ely. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Donavette Ely (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donavette Ely. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael M. Weinkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3040961, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Donavette Ely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E.D.Pa. Certificate of Good Standing) (Weinkowitz, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

6 #1

Exhibit E.D.Pa. Certificate of Good Standing

#9

(#9) Order re: #1 Complaint filed by Donavette Ely. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file and serve, no later than 8/2/2022, an amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies described herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/19/2022. (meh) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Richardson on behalf of Donavette Ely (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donavette Ely. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/23/2022)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer filed by Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Transfer Motion, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Panel Briefing Schedule) (Butler, M.) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

12 #1

Exhibit A - MDL Transfer Motion

12 #2

Exhibit B - MDL Panel Briefing Schedule

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Facebook Technologies, LLC, Facebook Holdings, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc. re: #12 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer (Butler, M.) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Butler, M.) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED pending a decision by the JPML. If Defendants have not yet filed their responsive pleadings, they shall do so either as directed by the District Court in MDL No. 3047 if the action is transferred, or if the action is not transferred, within 30 days of the denial of transfer. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/17/2022. (meh) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #14 filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Instagram, LLC., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Siculus, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statement has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer to Judge DuBose (nah) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Butler, M.) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Facebook Technologies, LLC, Facebook Holdings, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc. re: #12 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer (Butler, M.) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer filed by Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Transfer Motion, #2 Exhibit B - MDL Panel Briefing Schedule) (Butler, M.) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #11 Amended Complaint to Judge Nelson. (meh) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donavette Ely. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Richardson on behalf of Donavette Ely (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order re: #1 Complaint filed by Donavette Ely. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file and serve, no later than 8/2/2022, an amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies described herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/19/2022. (meh) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docket(#8) This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Michael M. Weinkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/18/2022. (clr) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael M. Weinkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (meh) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION and APPLICATION for Michael M. Weinkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3040961, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Donavette Ely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E.D.Pa. Certificate of Good Standing) (Weinkowitz, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#5) Answer due from Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (meh) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donavette Ely. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Donavette Ely (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3034652, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Donavette Ely. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant