This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2022 at 08:14:50 (UTC).

Eltahir v. Nomi Health, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 Eltahir filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Nomi Health, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Jared M. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-61046

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Jared M. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alaa Eltahir

Defendants

NOMI HEALTH, INC.

Medix Staffing, Inc.

1112 Weston Road #165

Weston, FL 33326

Mark Newman

Weston, FL 33326

Joshua WALKER

Weston, FL 33326

DANIEL SCHWENDIMAN

Weston, FL 33326

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. Andrew OBeidy

Attorney at Brody & OBeidy PA

11098 Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 300

Miami, FL 33161

Cathleen Ann Scott

Attorney at Scott Wagner & Associates, P.A.

250 South Central Boulevard, Jupiter Gardens Suite 104

Jupiter, FL 33458

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Michael McKinley

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

1075 Peachtree St., Ne, Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Compliance JOINT NOTICE by Alaa Eltahir (Scott, Cathleen) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#36

(#36) DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 7/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (emd) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#35

(#35) ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 4/24/2023 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 4/18/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 9/8/2022. All Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 12/27/2022. Mediation Deadline 1/12/2023. In Limine Motions due by 2/9/2023. Pretrial Motions due by 1/19/2023. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/9/2023. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for discovery matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

34 #1

Exhibit A - Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties

34 #34

Main Document

#33

(#33) Order Setting Settlement Conference via Video Conference for 8/8/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Joint Notice of Compliance & Confidential Settlement Statements due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 7/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (emd) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#32

(#32) RESPONSE to #24 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Amended Statement of Claim by Medix Staffing, Inc., Mark Newman, Nomi Health, Inc., Daniel Schwendiman, Joshua Walker. (McKinley, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

24 #2

Exhibit Paystubs

24 #1

Exhibit Court Orders

24 #24

Main Document

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Alaa Eltahir Statement of Claim (OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#9

(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against Alaa Eltahir, filed by Alaa Eltahir.(OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Medix Staffing, Inc., Mark Newman, Nomi Health, Inc., Daniel Schwendiman, Joshua Walker. (dj) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Alaa Eltahir Summonses (OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Alaa Eltahir re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet (OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#4

(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER re #4 Order. Instructions for Setting a Settlement Conference. The District Court has entered an Order, DE #4 , referring the case to me for a settlement conference. Accordingly, once counsel for Defendants appears in this case, counsel for the parties shall meet and confer to determine possible dates on which to conduct the settlement conference. Prior to the due date for Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim, Plaintiff's counsel shall email my Chambers at strauss@flsd.uscourts.gov with at least 3 dates on which the parties and their counsel are available for the settlement conference, within the time period allotted by the District Court's Order, DE #4 . Following the submission of proposed dates, I will enter an order setting the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 6/3/2022. (emd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A, Consent to Become Party/Representative

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Compliance JOINT NOTICE by Alaa Eltahir (Scott, Cathleen) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 7/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (emd) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 4/24/2023 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 4/18/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 9/8/2022. All Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 12/27/2022. Mediation Deadline 1/12/2023. In Limine Motions due by 2/9/2023. Pretrial Motions due by 1/19/2023. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/9/2023. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for discovery matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Medix Staffing, Inc., Mark Newman, Nomi Health, Inc., Daniel Schwendiman, Joshua Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties)(McKinley, Andrew) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Order Setting Settlement Conference via Video Conference for 8/8/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Joint Notice of Compliance & Confidential Settlement Statements due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 7/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (emd) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE to #24 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Amended Statement of Claim by Medix Staffing, Inc., Mark Newman, Nomi Health, Inc., Daniel Schwendiman, Joshua Walker. (McKinley, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Certificate of Other Affiliates by Mark Newman, Joshua Walker (McKinley, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Mark Newman, Joshua Walker. Attorney Andrew Michael McKinley added to party Mark Newman(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Michael McKinley added to party Joshua Walker(pty:dft). (McKinley, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting in part #26 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. The parties have up to and including July 27, 2022 to file a joint scheduling report. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER Dismissing Party Does 1 through 100. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Alaa Eltahir Statement of Claim (OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against Alaa Eltahir, filed by Alaa Eltahir.(OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Medix Staffing, Inc., Mark Newman, Nomi Health, Inc., Daniel Schwendiman, Joshua Walker. (dj) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Alaa Eltahir Summonses (OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Alaa Eltahir re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet (OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER re #4 Order. Instructions for Setting a Settlement Conference. The District Court has entered an Order, DE #4 , referring the case to me for a settlement conference. Accordingly, once counsel for Defendants appears in this case, counsel for the parties shall meet and confer to determine possible dates on which to conduct the settlement conference. Prior to the due date for Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim, Plaintiff's counsel shall email my Chambers at strauss@flsd.uscourts.gov with at least 3 dates on which the parties and their counsel are available for the settlement conference, within the time period allotted by the District Court's Order, DE #4 . Following the submission of proposed dates, I will enter an order setting the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 6/3/2022. (emd) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order requiring Plaintiff to file a Statement of Claim by 6/16/2022. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Settlement Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (mab) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Medix Staffing, Inc., NOMI HEALTH, INC., Mark Newman, DANIEL SCHWENDIMAN, Joshua WALKER. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-15687536, filed by Alaa Eltahir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Consent to Become Party/Representative)(OBeidy, A.) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOMI HEALTH, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDIX STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION is a litigant