This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2022 at 07:28:06 (UTC).

Elmer v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Elmer filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01584

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vern Elmer

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

National Default Servicing Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allison R. Schmidt

Attorney at Allison R Schmidt Esq. LLC

7250 S. Durango Drive, Suite 130-A295

Las Vegas, NV 89113

Defendant Attorneys

Karl L. Nielson

Attorney at Smith Larsen & Wixom

1935 Village Center Circle

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Kent F Larsen

Attorney at Smith Larsen & Wixom

1935 Village Center Circle

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Krista Nielson

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco, P.A.

10100 W. Charleston Blvd., Ste 220

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to complaint. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 12/13/2022; National Default Servicing Corp. answer due 12/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) and Order Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Larsen, Kent) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#12

(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to complaint. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 11/21/2022; National Default Servicing Corp. answer due 11/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Larsen, Kent) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vern Elmer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Schmidt, Allison) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/20/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/5/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to complaint. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 12/13/2022; National Default Servicing Corp. answer due 12/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) and Order Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Larsen, Kent) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to complaint. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 11/21/2022; National Default Servicing Corp. answer due 11/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Larsen, Kent) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vern Elmer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Schmidt, Allison) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by National Default Servicing Corp. re #1 Petition for Removal,,.. (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/20/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/5/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/20/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (TRW) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. added.. (Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eight Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-858239-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7054498) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Proof of service due by 12/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Larsen, Kent) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krista Nielson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent F Larsen