This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:52:21 (UTC).

Ellometer, LLC v. Steven's Living Trust et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Ellometer, LLC filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Steven's Living Trust. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven E. Rau and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02331

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven E. Rau

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ellometer, LLC

Defendants

Steven's Living Trust

27th & University, LLP

Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC

Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Edward Keenan

Attorney at Christoffel & Elliott, P.A.

444 Cedar St. Ste 1111

St Paul, MN 55101

Defendant Attorneys

Kristi K Brownson

Attorney at Brownson Norby, PLLC

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 4800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Joseph F Lulic

Attorney at Brownson Norby, PLLC

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 4800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint filed by 27th & University, LLP, Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, Steven's Living Trust. (Lulic, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Lulic on behalf of All Defendants. (Lulic, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K Brownson on behalf of All Defendants. (Brownson, Kristi) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ellometer, LLC (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellometer, LLC. Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellometer, LLC. Steven's Living Trust served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation. (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by Ellometer, LLC. Jointly Signed by Stevens Living Trust, 27th & University, LLP, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, and Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC. (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to 27th & University, LLP, Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, Steven's Living Trust. (MMP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7101355) filed by Ellometer, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint filed by 27th & University, LLP, Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, Steven's Living Trust. (Lulic, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F Lulic on behalf of All Defendants. (Lulic, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K Brownson on behalf of All Defendants. (Brownson, Kristi) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ellometer, LLC (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) (Text-only) ORDER on #4 Stipulation. 27th & University, LLP answer due 9/21/2019; Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC answer due 9/21/2019; Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC answer due 9/21/2019; Steven's Living Trust answer due 9/21/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 9/16/2019. (MME) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellometer, LLC. Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellometer, LLC. Steven's Living Trust served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation. (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by Ellometer, LLC. Jointly Signed by Stevens Living Trust, 27th & University, LLP, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, and Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC. (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to 27th & University, LLP, Paul Richards University and 27th, LLC, Scott Richards 27th, University, LLC, Steven's Living Trust. (MMP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2331 (WMW/SER). (MMP) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7101355) filed by Ellometer, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keenan, Charles) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less