This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 07:56:51 (UTC).

Ellison v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Ellison filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Susan Illston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03341

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Keith Ellison

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Joseph Leone

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Seth Micheal Kruglak

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Robin Dale Ball

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

555 South Flower, Forty-First Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

David Countryman

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Ave., 11Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) MOTION to Transfer Case (United States's Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue and Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Countryman, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

26 #1

Declaration

#26

(#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra ) (United States's Opposition to Motion for aTemporary Restraining Order) filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Countryman, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #23 Declaration in Support, (Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #20 Stipulation regarding TRO briefing schedule. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#23

(#23) Declaration in Support of #20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Suppor Attesting To The Filing of Stipulation Regarding TRO Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed byDonald Keith Ellison. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#22

(#22) Declaration of Seth M. Kruglak in Support of #20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Suppor Attesting to the Filing of Stipulation Regarding TRO Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed byDonald Keith Ellison. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra nt filed by Donald Keith Ellison and the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#4

(#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William J. Leone representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 MOTION to return property Served on US Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #5

Decl of William J Leone

1 #4

Decl of Donald K Ellison

1 #3

Proposed Order

1 #2

receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 MOTION to return property Served on US Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • ****Please Note****Correction made. For future filings please docket in Civil Miscellaneous Case 19-MC-80167-JST. Filing fee of $47.00 due for case 19-MC-80167. Application for Refund form available on our website for filing fee in case 19-cv-3341. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (srnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION to Transfer Case (United States's Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue and Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Countryman, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra ) (United States's Opposition to Motion for aTemporary Restraining Order) filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Countryman, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #23 Declaration in Support, (Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #20 Stipulation regarding TRO briefing schedule. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Declaration in Support of #20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Suppor Attesting To The Filing of Stipulation Regarding TRO Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed byDonald Keith Ellison. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Declaration of Seth M. Kruglak in Support of #20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Suppor Attesting to the Filing of Stipulation Regarding TRO Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed byDonald Keith Ellison. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Keith Ellison re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 MOTION to return property Served on US Attorney for the District of Puerto Rico (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warra nt filed by Donald Keith Ellison and the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to Suspend Efforts by the United States to Liquidate Assets Seized in This District and Motion to Unseal Affidavits and Other Supporting Documents in Support of Seizure Warrant; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Donald Keith Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin D. Ball in Support of Ex Parte Motion for a TRO, #2 Declaration of William J. Leone in Support of Ex Parte Motion for a TRO, #3 Proposed Order)(Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Seth Michael Kruglak representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William J. Leone representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donald Keith Ellison.. (Ball, Robin) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Seth M. Kruglak ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13434446.) filed by Donald Keith Ellison. (Kruglak, Seth) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - William J. Leone ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13434395.) filed by Donald Keith Ellison. (Leone, William) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to return property filed by Donald Keith Ellison. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 6/26/2019. Replies due by 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #3 Proposed Order, #4 Decl of Donald K Ellison, #5 Decl of William J Leone) (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less