This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/03/2023 at 07:10:06 (UTC).

Ellis v. Westlake Financial Services et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2023 Ellis filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Westlake Financial Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAVAR ELLIS

Defendants

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Zemel

Attorney at Zemel Law LLC

660 Broadway

Patterson, NJ 07514

Defendant Attorneys

A J Fabianczyk

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

33 E Main St - Ste 300, Po Box 1379

Madison, WI 53701

Marci V Kawski

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

33 E Main St - Ste 300, Po Box 1379

Madison, WI 53701

Joseph N Parsons

Attorney at Jones Day

1 Mellon Bank Ctr, 500 Grant St - Ste 4500

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2514

Tanya M Salman

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

1 S Pinckney St - Ste 700, Po Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701-1806

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants LAVAR ELLIS by LAVAR ELLIS. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4291320) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Zemel, Daniel) Modified on 1/4/2023 (rcm).

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by Lavar Ellis. (Zemel, Daniel)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by A J Fabianczyk on behalf of Westlake Financial Services. Attorney(s) appearing: AJ Fabianczyk (Fabianczyk, A J)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by Westlake Financial Services. (Fabianczyk, A J)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya M Salman on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Tanya M. Salman (Salman, Tanya)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Salman, Tanya)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salman, Tanya)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N Parsons on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph N. Parsons (Parsons, Joseph)

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE Statement by Westlake Financial Services. (Fabianczyk, A J)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/21/2023 re #9 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The court GRANTS the defendant's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant Experian Information Solutions to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on March 13, 2023. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE Statement by Westlake Financial Services. (Fabianczyk, A J)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N Parsons on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph N. Parsons (Parsons, Joseph)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salman, Tanya)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Salman, Tanya)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya M Salman on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Tanya M. Salman (Salman, Tanya)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNOTICE to DEFENDANT- Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (edr) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/15/2023 re #5 Defendant Westlake Financial Services' (Unopposed) Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The court GRANTS the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant Westlake Financial Services to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on March 16, 2023. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by Westlake Financial Services. (Fabianczyk, A J)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by A J Fabianczyk on behalf of Westlake Financial Services. Attorney(s) appearing: AJ Fabianczyk (Fabianczyk, A J)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (rcm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by Lavar Ellis. (Zemel, Daniel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lavar Ellis. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zemel, Daniel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketFINAL NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 7 days; the form is available #here. In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (rcm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 7 days; the form is available #here. In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (rcm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants LAVAR ELLIS by LAVAR ELLIS. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4291320) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Zemel, Daniel) Modified on 1/4/2023 (rcm).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less