This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:34:02 (UTC).

Ellis v. Penzone et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Ellis filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Penzone. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Camille D Bibles (PS) and John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04427

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Camille D Bibles (PS)

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

April Chavon Ellis

Phoenix, AZ 85009

Defendants

Paul Penzone

Maricopa County Estrella Jail

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by April Chavon Ellis. (5 pages) (REK) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by April Chavon Ellis. (3 pages) (REK) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied as moot. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a file a non-prisoner Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a non-prisoner Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/10/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by April Chavon Ellis. (7 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REK) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by April Chavon Ellis: 6901 S McClintock Dr., Apt. 158, Tempe, AZ 85283. (1 page) (REK) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by April Chavon Ellis. (5 pages) (REK) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied as moot. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a file a non-prisoner Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a non-prisoner Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/10/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by April Chavon Ellis: 6901 S McClintock Dr., Apt. 158, Tempe, AZ 85283. (1 page) (REK) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by April Chavon Ellis. (3 pages) (REK) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by April Chavon Ellis. (3 pages) (REK) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by April Chavon Ellis. (7 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REK) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.