Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:55:06 (UTC).

Ellis v. Meyers et al (INMATE 1)

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Ellis filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Meyers INMATE 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are W. Harold Albritton, III and Wallace Capel, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01068

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

Referral Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cory L. Ellis

Clio, AL 36017-2615

Defendants

D. Ray

Cpt. Lawson

Officer Downing

C. Gordy

Walter Meyers

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for Plf's failure to provide the court with a current address; Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/29/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the dfts shall file no response to the complaint unless and until further order of the court. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/29/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 1/24/2020, the plf shall file with the court a current address and SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to adequately prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/14/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#12

(#12) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for Captain Lawson, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#11

(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for C. Gordy, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#10

(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for Officer Downing, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#9

(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for D. Ray, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for Walter Meyers, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 02/18/2020; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named dfts and ALDOC General Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 01/06/2020. (bes, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Easterling CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 01/06/2020. (FURN: Cashier) (bes, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from the Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 2:19-cv-01837-CLM-JHE; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, & certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER, entered in ND/AL: the magistrate judge's #3 report and recommendation is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED; Accordingly, the court ORDERS this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/20/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, entered in ND/AL: the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama; Objections to R&R due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/26/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, filed in ND/AL, by Cory L. Ellis. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#1

(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT, filed in ND/AL, against Officer Downing, C. Gordy, Cpt. Lawson, Walter Meyers, D. Ray, filed by Cory L. Ellis. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; #15 Recommendation sent to Cory L. Ellis was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward". (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; #14 Order sent to Cory L. Ellis was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward". (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for Plf's failure to provide the court with a current address; Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/29/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the dfts shall file no response to the complaint unless and until further order of the court. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/29/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; #13 Order to Show Cause sent to Cory L. Ellis was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 1/24/2020, the plf shall file with the court a current address and SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to adequately prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/14/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; #6 & #7 Orders sent to Cory L. Ellis were returned with the following notation, " Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for Captain Lawson, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for C. Gordy, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for Officer Downing, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for D. Ray, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Order, signed by Sharon Blakely for Walter Meyers, served on 1/8/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 02/18/2020; copies mailed to plf; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named dfts and ALDOC General Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 01/06/2020. (bes, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Easterling CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 01/06/2020. (FURN: Cashier) (bes, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from the Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 2:19-cv-01837-CLM-JHE; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, & certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via EMAIL from the Clerk. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER, entered in ND/AL: the magistrate judge's #3 report and recommendation is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED; Accordingly, the court ORDERS this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/20/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, entered in ND/AL: the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama; Objections to R&R due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/26/2019. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, filed in ND/AL, by Cory L. Ellis. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT, filed in ND/AL, against Officer Downing, C. Gordy, Cpt. Lawson, Walter Meyers, D. Ray, filed by Cory L. Ellis. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less