This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2020 at 14:29:52 (UTC).

Ellis v. Drive New Jersey Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Ellis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Drive New Jersey Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01099

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Ellis

Defendants

Radius Moving and Storage

Drive New Jersey Insurance Company

Juan Roman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason F. Giles

Attorney at The King Firm, LLC

2912 Canal Street, 2Nd Floor

New Orleans, LA 70119

Anthony Joseph Milazzo, III

Attorney at The King Firm, LLC

2912 Canal Street, 2Nd Floor

New Orleans, LA 70119

Justin Anthony Reese

Attorney at The King Firm, LLC

2912 Canal Street, 2Nd Floor

New Orleans, LA 70119

Brian King

Attorney at The King Firm, LLC

2912 Canal Street, 2Nd Floor

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Megan C. Kiefer

Attorney at Kiefer & Kiefer

2310 Metairie Rd.

Metairie, LA 70001

Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr.

Attorney at Kiefer & Kiefer

2310 Metairie Rd.

Metairie, LA 70001

Amanda Gammon Morse

Attorney at Kiefer & Kiefer

2310 Metairie Rd.

Metairie, LA 70001

Christopher M Short

Attorney at Kiefer & Kiefer

2310 Metairie Rd.

Metairie, LA 70001

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 6/17/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon by telephone. Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 12/18/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ko) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, MAY 7, 2020, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511 Access code: 6655019 By Clerk.(jeg) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Answer to Petition for Damages by Radius Moving and Storage, Juan Roman. Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Radius Moving and Storage(pty:dft), Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Juan Roman(pty:dft).(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Justin Reese of Petition for Damages served on Juan Roman, Radius Moving and Storage, Drive New Jersey Insurance Company on 3/17/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Drive New Jersey Insurance Company (Kiefer, Nat) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Compliance Under 28 U.S.C 1447(b) by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Kiefer, Nat) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company.(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/3/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

1 #7

Affidavit

1 #6

State Court Pleadings

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-13175 Div A Sec 16 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8244931) filed by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit- State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Pleadings, #7 Affidavit)Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Drive New Jersey Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/3/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 6/17/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon by telephone. Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 12/18/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ko) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, MAY 7, 2020, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511 Access code: 6655019 By Clerk.(jeg) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Answer to Petition for Damages by Radius Moving and Storage, Juan Roman. Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Radius Moving and Storage(pty:dft), Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Juan Roman(pty:dft).(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Justin Reese of Petition for Damages served on Juan Roman, Radius Moving and Storage, Drive New Jersey Insurance Company on 3/17/2020. (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company for Reasonable Notice of Surgery (Kiefer, Nat) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Drive New Jersey Insurance Company (Kiefer, Nat) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Compliance Under 28 U.S.C 1447(b) by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Kiefer, Nat) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company.(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/3/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-13175 Div A Sec 16 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8244931) filed by Drive New Jersey Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit- State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Pleadings, #7 Affidavit)Attorney Nat Gerard Kiefer, Jr added to party Drive New Jersey Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Kiefer, Nat) Modified text on 4/3/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.