This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2020 at 10:15:30 (UTC).

Ellis v. Air Components, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 Ellis filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Air Components, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Annie T Christoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02441

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Annie T Christoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miriam Ellis

Defendants

Air Components, Inc.

Aubrey Tucker

Tucker Seismic Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Benjamin Alan Matthews

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YESIER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Elizabeth Stuart

Attorney at BURCH, PORTER & JOHNSON

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Jennifer Shorb Hagerman

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #21 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/7/2020. (shl) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#21

(#21) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Breach of Contract Claim (proposed order submitted) by Miriam Ellis. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #19 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/27/2020. (shl) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#19

(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Breach of Contract Claim (Unopposed) Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#18

(#18) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, August 21, 2020 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Stuart on behalf of All Defendants (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

14 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Breach of Contract Claim

#14

(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Breach of Contract Claim (Unopposed) Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Air Components, Inc., Aubrey Tucker, Tucker Seismic Solutions, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Tucker Seismic Solutions, #2 Aubrey Tucker)(jae) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Judge Unassigned 7 added. (jae) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Miriam Ellis (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

1 #4

Summons to be Issued

1 #3

Summons to be Issued

1 #2

Summons to be Issued

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Air Components, Inc., Aubrey Tucker, Tucker Seismic Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3372434), filed by Miriam Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be Issued, #3 Summons to be Issued, #4 Summons to be Issued)(Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#23) Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. (agj) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #21 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/7/2020. (shl) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Breach of Contract Claim (proposed order submitted) by Miriam Ellis. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #19 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/27/2020. (shl) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Breach of Contract Claim (Unopposed) Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, August 21, 2020 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Stuart on behalf of All Defendants (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tucker Seismic Solutions, LLC. (Hagerman, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Components, Inc.. (Hagerman, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Ellis as to Aubrey Tucker, Tucker Seismic Solutions, LLC. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Ellis as to Air Components, Inc.. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Air Components, Inc., Aubrey Tucker, Tucker Seismic Solutions, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Tucker Seismic Solutions, #2 Aubrey Tucker)(jae) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Judge Unassigned 7 added. (jae) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Miriam Ellis (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Air Components, Inc., Aubrey Tucker, Tucker Seismic Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3372434), filed by Miriam Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be Issued, #3 Summons to be Issued, #4 Summons to be Issued)(Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Alan Matthews

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Emmett Turner, IV