This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:50:06 (UTC).

Ellis et al v. VXI Global Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Ellis filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against VXI Global Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00871

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cathilia Whitmore

Shaclecha Stoddard

Kanika Vaughn

William Taylor

Ortize Holmes

Chasity Banks

Kevin R. Taylor, Sr.

Asaiah Pullin

Melissa Rivera

Quincy E. Patterson

Nissa Martin

Kristy Cook

Ursula White

Monique Talley

Keosha Lee

Malahika LaGuerre

Valeesa Barnes

Lenaisha Irizarry

Jonathan Sigler, Sr.

Erica Stinson

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert E. DeRose, II

Attorney at Barkan Meizlish DeRose Wentz McInerney Peifer

10Th Floor, 250 East Broad Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Jessica R. Doogan

Attorney at Barkan Meizlish DeRose Wentz McInerney Peifer

10Th Floor, 250 East Broad Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Austin W. Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Alexander

819 North Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

William Clifton Alexander

Attorney at Anderson Alexander

819 North Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Other Attorneys

Edmond J. Mack

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas & Mannos

8Th Floor, 220 Market Avenue, S

Canton, OH 44702

Lee E. Plakas

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas & Mannos

8Th Floor, 220 Market Avenue, S

Canton, OH 44702

David L. Dingwell

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas, Mannos & Recupero

8Th Floor, 220 Market Avenue, S

Canton, OH 44702

 

Court Documents

#22

15 #1

Exhibit A - arbitration agreements

#15

12 #5

Attachment No. 5

12 #4

Attachment No. 4

12 #3

Attachment No. 3

12 #2

Attachment No. 2

12 #1

Attachment No. 1

#12

5 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to Join

#5

4 #1

Exhibit A - Consent to Join

#4

3 #1

Exhibit A - Consents to Join

#3

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Order Pending is Defendant's Motion to Stay or Continue Initial Discovery Protocols Order Pending Arbitration Determination (ECF No. #15 ). A stay or continuance is not appropriate at this time. Accordingly, the motion is denied. On 5/13/2019, the Court entered two Orders, i.e., Initial Discovery Protocols (ECF No. #11 ) and Telephonic Case Management Conference Scheduling Order (ECF No. #12 ). The purpose of the protocol is to encourage parties and their counsel to exchange the most relevant information and documents early in the case, to assist in framing the issues to be resolved and to plan for more efficient and targeted discovery. Defendant has not provided the purported arbitration agreements for each party plaintiff in this matter and has not otherwise represented that those individuals have arbitration agreements with Defendant. Because the arbitration issue is not yet before the Court, and the Court has not determined the validity of the agreements at issue, Defendant shall forthwith comply with the requirements of the Initial Discovery Protocols. Counsel are reminded that this case is set for a Telephonic Case Management Conference on 7/17/2019. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/1/2019.(S,Ke) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Notice of Filing Consents To Join filed by Patrice Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Zakerius Gresham, #2 Exhibit Consent of Adonsha Richardson)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Order granting Motions for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorneys William Clifton "Clif" Alexander and Austin W. Anderson for Plaintiffs Patrice Ellis and Gladys Sifuentes and all opt-in Plaintiffs and others similarly situated. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #18 , #19 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/18/2019. (JLG) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Motion for attorney Austin W. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9365342, filed by Tony Alexander, Lalia Allen-Bailey, Marcus Ard, ShaNorris Arnold, Chasity Banks, Valeesa Barnes, Mikhelle Bass, Deonte Battle, Rosa Delgado Branes, Latasha Brown, Tyrek Burnett, Danette Butler, Lakeisha Chambers, Kristy Cook, Mikeshia Darden, Alexander Douglas, Patrice Ellis, Sandra Epps, Dana Hardy, Trovelous Harrison, Jynger Head, Tawana Hector, Jessica Henderson, Mercedez Holloway, Ortize Holmes, Lenaisha Irizarry, Jhadasia Jackson, Tia Jackson, Ksharmel Jefferson, Frank B. Johnson, Alexandria Jones, Brandon Jones, Jakiyah Jones, Rasheedah Jones, Celeste Kelly, Jenee M. Kelly, Malahika LaGuerre, Kayla Lawence, Keosha Lee, Aaron Leigh, Jasmine Littles, Nadir Love, Nissa Martin, Tre Xavier McDaniel, Princella McGhee, Lauren McKinney, Simmion McKnight, Tonya G McLeroy, Jerrett Miles, Valencia Miller, Giovanni Milling, Dannisha Mitchell, Tonika Montague, Shamika Morgan, Taylor Nixon, Devon Owens, Amanda Parisi, Quincy E. Patterson, Courtney Peacock, Jasmine Perry, Brittany Pippins, Allison Pringle, Asaiah Pullin, LaTasha Reed, Lashawnda Renolds, Champagne Riggins, Melissa Rivera, Valincea Robinson, Katrina Rodriguez, Jocelyn Rooks, Gladys Sifuentes, Jonathan Sigler, Sr, Erica Stinson, Shaclecha Stoddard, Kirstee Sullivant, Monique Talley, Kevin R. Taylor, Sr, William Taylor, Basil J Varner, Kanika Vaughn, Carol Warner, Rashawn Watkins, Ursula White, Cathilia Whitmore, Crishonda Williams, Yakia Wilson, Elizabeth Wynn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Motion for attorney William Clifton Clif Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9365316, filed by Tony Alexander, Lalia Allen-Bailey, Marcus Ard, ShaNorris Arnold, Chasity Banks, Valeesa Barnes, Mikhelle Bass, Deonte Battle, Rosa Delgado Branes, Latasha Brown, Tyrek Burnett, Danette Butler, Lakeisha Chambers, Kristy Cook, Mikeshia Darden, Alexander Douglas, Patrice Ellis, Sandra Epps, Dana Hardy, Trovelous Harrison, Jynger Head, Tawana Hector, Jessica Henderson, Mercedez Holloway, Ortize Holmes, Lenaisha Irizarry, Jhadasia Jackson, Tia Jackson, Ksharmel Jefferson, Frank B. Johnson, Alexandria Jones, Brandon Jones, Jakiyah Jones, Rasheedah Jones, Celeste Kelly, Jenee M. Kelly, Malahika LaGuerre, Kayla Lawence, Keosha Lee, Aaron Leigh, Jasmine Littles, Nadir Love, Nissa Martin, Tre Xavier McDaniel, Princella McGhee, Lauren McKinney, Simmion McKnight, Tonya G McLeroy, Jerrett Miles, Valencia Miller, Giovanni Milling, Dannisha Mitchell, Tonika Montague, Shamika Morgan, Taylor Nixon, Devon Owens, Amanda Parisi, Quincy E. Patterson, Courtney Peacock, Jasmine Perry, Brittany Pippins, Allison Pringle, Asaiah Pullin, LaTasha Reed, Lashawnda Renolds, Champagne Riggins, Melissa Rivera, Valincea Robinson, Katrina Rodriguez, Jocelyn Rooks, Gladys Sifuentes, Jonathan Sigler, Sr, Erica Stinson, Shaclecha Stoddard, Kirstee Sullivant, Monique Talley, Kevin R. Taylor, Sr, William Taylor, Basil J Varner, Kanika Vaughn, Carol Warner, Rashawn Watkins, Ursula White, Cathilia Whitmore, Crishonda Williams, Yakia Wilson, Elizabeth Wynn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Response to #15 Motion to stay or continue Initial Discovery Protocols Order pending arbitration determination filed by All Plaintiffs. (DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by VXI Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ellis Arbitration Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sifuentes Arbitration Agreement)(Dingwell, David) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Motion to stay or continue Initial Discovery Protocols Order pending arbitration determination filed by Defendant VXI Global Solutions, LLC. Related document(s) #11 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - arbitration agreements)(Dingwell, David) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice of Consents to Join filed by Patrice Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Consent to Join filed by Patrice Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of appearance of Counsel for defendant by David L. Dingwell, Lee E. Plakas, and Edmond J. Mack filed by All Defendants. (Dingwell, David) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Filing Consent to Join filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Affidavit of Service filed by All Plaintiffs. (DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Filing Consent to Join filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing Consent to Join filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing Consent to Join filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon VXI Global Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,Br) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,Br) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (Y,Br) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Collective and Class Action Complaint with jury demand against VXI Global Solutions, LLC Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9264032. Filed by Gladys Sifuentes, Patrice Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DeRose, Robert) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L. Dingwell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edmond J. Mack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee E Plakas