This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2019 at 07:43:48 (UTC).

Ellis et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Ellis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ed Kinkeade and Irma Carrillo Ramirez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01496

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Ed Kinkeade

Irma Carrillo Ramirez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danielle Ellis

Andrae Ellis

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel Hatten Adams

Attorney at Eberstein & Witherite LLP

10440 N Central Expressway, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75231

Amy Kathleen Witherite

Attorney at Eberstein & Witherite LLP

10440 North Central Expressway, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Keron Andre Wright

Attorney at Stewart Law Group PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

Amy M Stewart

Attorney at Stewart Law Group PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2020. Discovery due by 6/9/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/23/2020. Motions due by 7/7/2020. Status Report due by 6/30/2020. Trial set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/29/2019) (mcrd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Danielle Ellis, Andrae Ellis. (Hatten Adams, Rachel) Modified to add filer on 7/5/2019 (zkc). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report, which shall be filed no later than 10 days from the date of the scheduling conference (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/25/2019) (svc) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #4

Additional Page(s) Certified Docket Sheet

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #2

Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

1 #1

Declaration(s) Certificate of Interested Parties

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 68th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number dc-19-07060 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10071849) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet, #4 Additional Page(s) Certified Docket Sheet) (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2020. Discovery due by 6/9/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/23/2020. Motions due by 7/7/2020. Status Report due by 6/30/2020. Trial set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/29/2019) (mcrd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Status Report filed on July 25, 2019. It appears the parties have consented in writing to trial of this case before a United States Magistrate Judge in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636 (c). (See Paragraph m.) It is therefore ORDERED by the Court that this case be, and it is hereby TRANSFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez to conduct all further proceedings and the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c), with any appeal therefrom to be taken to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(3). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/26/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Danielle Ellis, Andrae Ellis. (Hatten Adams, Rachel) Modified to add filer on 7/5/2019 (zkc). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report, which shall be filed no later than 10 days from the date of the scheduling conference (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/25/2019) (svc) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, see document #1 -1 for image, by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (mla) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 68th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number dc-19-07060 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10071849) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet, #4 Additional Page(s) Certified Docket Sheet) (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keron Andre Wright

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Marie Stewart