This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2019 at 07:44:31 (UTC).

Ellis-Barr et al v. CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Ellis-Barr filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Max O. Cogburn, Jr and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00464

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shalae Ellis-Barr

Brittani Thompson

Defendants

CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L.P.

Tesco Properties, Inc.

Shawn Lisenby

Mavis Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Isaac Wade Sturgill

Attorney at Legal Aid of North Carolina, Inc.

335 Billingsley Road, 2Nd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28211

Thomas Pearson Holderness

Attorney at Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.

101 N. Tryon St. Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Robert Benton

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein L.L.P.

Three Wachovia Center, 401 South Tryon Street, Ste. 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Meredith S. Jeffries

Attorney at Alexander Ricks PLLC

1420 E. 7Th St., Suite 100

Charlotte, NC 28204

Nathan Adam White

Attorney at Alexander Ricks PLLC

1420 E. 7Th St., Suite 100

Charlotte, NC 28204

Mark W. Bakker

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, LLC

55 E. Camperdown Way, Suite 400

Greenville, SC 29601

Katie Burchette

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, PLLC

227 West Trade Street, Suite 1550

Charlotte, NC 28202

Zebulon Dyer Anderson

Attorney at Smith Anderson

Po Box 2611, 2500 Wachovia Capitol Center

Raleigh, NC 27602

 

Court Documents

#18

17 #1

Memorandum Brief in Support

#17

16 #5

Exhibit

16 #4

Exhibit

16 #3

Exhibit

16 #2

Exhibit

16 #1

Appendix

#16

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

#3

#2

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Meredith S. Jeffries, Nathan Adam White on behalf of CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L.P., Tesco Properties, Inc., Attorney Jason Robert Benton terminated. (Jeffries, Meredith) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to serve Summons; granting #17 Motion to Amend/Correct Summons. Time for service of amended Summons extended to January 13, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/12/2019. (DLG) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process , MOTION to Amend/Correct Summons ( Responses due by 11/26/2019 ) by Shalae Ellis-Barr, Brittani Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief in Support)(Sturgill, Isaac). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Shalae Ellis-Barr, Brittani Thompson. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Holderness, Thomas) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mavis Williams' answer due 12/30/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/12/2019. (DLG) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #5 Amended Complaint by Mavis Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Zebulon). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Wade Sturgill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sturgill, Isaac) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L.P., Tesco Properties, Inc. (Benton, Jason) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shawn Lisenby's answer due 11/16/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/16/2019. (DLG) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #5 Amended Complaint by Shawn Lisenby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bakker, Mark). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mavis Williams (Anderson, Zebulon) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Consent to Removal re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Mavis Williams.(Anderson, Zebulon) Modified on 10/16/2019, to correct docket text, wrong event was used and a filing fee was charged (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4218813), NEF re-generated and a request for refund to be filed (thh). (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Zebulon Dyer Anderson on behalf of Mavis Williams (Anderson, Zebulon) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Shalae Ellis-Barr, Brittani Thompson.(Holderness, Thomas) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L.P.'s answer due 10/9/2019; Tesco Properties, Inc.'s answer due 10/9/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 09/23/2019. (DLG) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint by CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L.P., Tesco Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benton, Jason). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tesco Properties, Inc. (Benton, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L.P. (Benton, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County District Court, case number 19-CVD-16055. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4183200), filed by CP/DB Housing Partners XIII, L.P., Tesco Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Process and Pleadings)(Benton, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan Adam White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark W Bakker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON R. BENTON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEBULON D. ANDERSON