This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2021 at 18:17:09 (UTC).

Elliott v. Cartagena et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 Elliott filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cartagena. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01998

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric A Elliott

Defendants

Shandel Green

Terror Squad Entertainment

Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Joey and Ryan Music

Marcello Valenzano

Edward F Davadi, Jr.

Roc Nation Management LLC

Remynisce Music

Excuse My French Music

Reminisce Smith Mackie

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Francis Malofiy

Alfred Joseph Fluehr

Defendant Attorneys

Eleanor Martine Lackman

Elaine Nguyen

Hillel Ira Parness

Ilene Susan Farkas

Dariush Ghaffar Adli

Efrat Cohen

Other Attorneys

David Alexander Munkittrick

Sandra Allison Crawshaw

Tamar Y. Duvdevani

Kerry Anne O'Neill

 

Court Documents

191 #1

Reply Declaration of Elaine Nguyen In Further Support of Defendants' Renew

184 #10

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit I - 2-25-21 - Elliott - Pacheco - Compressed

184 #9

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit H - A. Gibson Affidavit - Facebook and Email Service

184 #8

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit G - C. Gibson Affidavit of Service - Mailing to 465 9th S

184 #7

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit F - C. Gibson Affidavit of Service - Mailing to 1402 Rive

184 #6

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit E - 02.10.20 - Subpoena on Elis Pacheco

184 #5

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit D - 12.16.20 - Cartagena Subpoena on Elis Pacheco

184 #4

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit C - 10.19.20 - Subpoena on Elis Pacheco

184 #3

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit B - 09.01.20 - Cartagena Subpoena on Elis Pacheco

184 #2

Nguyen Decl - Exhibit A - 08.24.20 - Subpoena on Elis Pacheco

184 #1

DECLARATION OF ELAINE NGUYEN

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

#1

169 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#191) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #184 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Joseph Anthony Cartagena, Joey and Ryan Music, Reminisce Smith Mackie, Remynisce Music, Sneaker Addict Touring LLC, Terror Squad Entertainment, Terror Squad Productions, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Elaine Nguyen In Further Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion For Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit J to Reply Declaration of Elaine Nguyen).(Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 5/10/2021. (mml) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#190) ORDER granting #189 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/30/2021) (mml) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#189) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Eleanor M. Lackman dated April 29, 2021. Document filed by Joseph Anthony Cartagena, Joey and Ryan Music, Reminisce Smith Mackie, RNG (Rap's New Generation), Remynisce Music, Sneaker Addict Touring LLC, Terror Squad Entertainment, Terror Squad Productions, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc...(Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#188) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #184 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment . ***Letter Summarizing Supp. Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment***. Document filed by Eric A Elliott..(Malofiy, Francis) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#187) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #184 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Eric A Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Response to Rule 56.1 Supp. Statement of Undisputed Facts).(Malofiy, Francis) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#186) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Eleanor M. Lackman dated 04/12/2021 re: Pursuant to Your Honors Individual Rule 2(E)(1), Defendants respectfully submit this letter in conjunction with their opening memorandum of law in support of their Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Joseph Anthony Cartagena, Joey and Ryan Music, Reminisce Smith Mackie, RNG (Rap's New Generation), Remynisce Music, Sneaker Addict Touring LLC, Terror Squad Entertainment, Terror Squad Productions, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc...(Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#185) RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Joseph Anthony Cartagena, Joey and Ryan Music, Reminisce Smith Mackie, RNG (Rap's New Generation), Remynisce Music, Sneaker Addict Touring LLC, Terror Squad Entertainment, Terror Squad Productions, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc...(Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#184) MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Joseph Anthony Cartagena, Joey and Ryan Music, Reminisce Smith Mackie, RNG (Rap's New Generation), Remynisce Music, Sneaker Addict Touring LLC, Terror Squad Entertainment, Terror Squad Productions, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF ELAINE NGUYEN, #2 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit A - 08.24.20 - Subpoena on Elis Pacheco, #3 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit B - 09.01.20 - Cartagena Subpoena on Elis Pacheco, #4 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit C - 10.19.20 - Subpoena on Elis Pacheco, #5 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit D - 12.16.20 - Cartagena Subpoena on Elis Pacheco, #6 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit E - 02.10.20 - Subpoena on Elis Pacheco, #7 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit F - C. Gibson Affidavit of Service - Mailing to 1402 River Road, #8 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit G - C. Gibson Affidavit of Service - Mailing to 465 9th Street, #9 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit H - A. Gibson Affidavit - Facebook and Email Service, #10 Nguyen Decl - Exhibit I - 2-25-21 - Elliott - Pacheco - Compressed, #11 Memo of Law ISO MSJ).(Lackman, Eleanor) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#183) ORDER: ORDERED that defendants are granted leave to renew their motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff will have fourteen (14) days to file a response as provided for in the July 31 Order. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/30/2021) (ama) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
196 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #2 MOTION for Alfred Joseph Fluehr to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16438839. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #5 MOTION for Francis Malofiy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16439410. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standings. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Francis Malofiy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16439410. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eric A Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fluehr, Alfred) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fluehr, Alfred) Modified on 3/5/2019 (pne). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Fluehr, Alfred) Modified on 3/5/2019 (pne). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Alfred Joseph Fluehr to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16438839. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eric A Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fluehr, Alfred) Modified on 3/13/2019 (wb). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Roc Nation LLC, Roc Nation Management LLC, Sneaker Addict Touring LLC, Terror Squad Productions, Inc., Terror Squad Entertainment, RNG, Empire Distribution, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Eric A Elliott. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fluehr, Alfred) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Kobalt Songs Music Publishing, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., Reach Global Inc., Sony/ATV Allegro, First N Platinum Publishing, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Cuts of Reach Music, Songs of Reach Global, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., First N Gold Publishing, Inc., Reach Music Publishing Inc., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Eric A Elliott, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Kobalt Songs Music Publishing, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., Reach Global Inc., Sony/ATV Allegro, First N Platinum Publishing, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Sony/ATV Tunes LLC, Cuts of Reach Music, Songs of Reach Global, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., First N Gold Publishing, Inc., Reach Music Publishing Inc., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fluehr, Alfred) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Joey and Ryan Music, Excuse My French Music, Excuse My French Music II, Mr. Green Music, Remynisce Music, Dade Co. Project Music, Inc., Po Folks Music added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Eric A Elliott. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Fluehr, Alfred) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Joseph A. Cartagena, Karim Kharbouch, Shandel Green, Reminisce Smith Mackie, Marcello Valenzano, Andre Lyon, Edward F Davadi, Jr.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16438293)Document filed by Eric A Elliott.(Fluehr, Alfred) Modified on 3/5/2019 (pne). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less