This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 08:21:32 (UTC).

Elliott-Fougere v. CSAA General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Elliott-Fougere filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CSAA General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02473

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sara Elliott-Fougere

Defendant

CSAA General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa J. Winthers

Attorney at Ogborn Mihm, LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2700

Denver, CO 80203

Quinn Stover Girrens

Attorney at Ogborn Mihm, LLP

1700 Lincoln St, Ste 2700

Denver, CO 80203

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Emma Kathleen Knight

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 October 2021. Due to a change in Magistrate Judge Neureiter's schedule, the SchedulingConference set on December 21, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET onDecember 20, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER (csarr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Sara Elliott-Fougere All parties consent.. (Girrens, Quinn) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa J. Winthers on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Melissa J. Winthers added to party Sara Elliott-Fougere(pty:pla) (Winthers, Melissa) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Quinn Stover Girrens on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Quinn Stover Girrens added to party Sara Elliott-Fougere(pty:pla) (Girrens, Quinn) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #6 Complaint and Jury Demand by CSAA General Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 September 2021. Consent Form due by 12/7/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/14/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/15/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02473-NRN. (trvo, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

6 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 #6

Main Document

#2

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

State Court Register of Actions

1 #8

Exhibit D-Secretary of State Periodic Report

1 #7

Exhibit C-Registered Voter Information

1 #6

Exhibit B-Employment records

1 #4

Exhibit A-State Court Summons

1 #3

Exhibit A-Delay Reduction Order

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 October 2021. Due to a change in Magistrate Judge Neureiter's schedule, the SchedulingConference set on December 21, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET onDecember 20, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER (csarr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/13/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Sara Elliott-Fougere All parties consent.. (Girrens, Quinn) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa J. Winthers on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Melissa J. Winthers added to party Sara Elliott-Fougere(pty:pla) (Winthers, Melissa) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Quinn Stover Girrens on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Quinn Stover Girrens added to party Sara Elliott-Fougere(pty:pla) (Girrens, Quinn) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #6 Complaint and Jury Demand by CSAA General Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #9 to Melissa J. Winthers and Quinn S. Girrens c/o Ogborn Mihm, LLP, 1700Lincoln Street, Suite 2700, Denver, Colorado 80203. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 September 2021. Consent Form due by 12/7/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/14/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/15/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02473-NRN. (trvo, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against CSAA General Insurance Company, filed by Sara Elliott-Fougere. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(norlin, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number COX100410 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner on behalf of CSAA General Insurance CompanyAttorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSAA General Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2021CV32579. (Filing fee $ 402)., filed by CSAA General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-Delay Reduction Order, #4 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, #5 Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service, #6 Exhibit B-Employment records, #7 Exhibit C-Registered Voter Information, #8 Exhibit D-Secretary of State Periodic Report, #9 State Court Register of Actions, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Knight, Emma) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emma Kathleen Knight

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Kirsten Wagner