This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 07:22:27 (UTC).

Elliot v. Reynolds Metals Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Elliot filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Reynolds Metals Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05689

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randall Elliot

Defendant

Reynolds Metals Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Jon Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

650 South Shackleford Road, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 1/6/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the hearing is 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747.Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randall Elliot. Reynolds Metals Company, LLC waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Randall Elliot; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17472480. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 1/6/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the hearing is 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747.Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randall Elliot. Reynolds Metals Company, LLC waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Randall Elliot; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17472480. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REYNOLDS METALS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Sanford