This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:41:46 (UTC).

Ellerman v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Ellerman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROM TRADER and JILL A. OTAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

Presiding Judge

JILL A. OTAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michale Ellerman

Lihue, HI 96766

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Normand R. Lezy

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael J. Nakano

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Shawn L.M. Benton

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Certificate of Service

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Election Form

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#8

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) Scheduling Conference Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#13

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE not held.Discussion had. Pro se Plaintiff reports making efforts to secure counsel. Court reminds Plaintiff of responsibilities as a pro se litigant, to comply with all court rules, orders and and deadlines. Court encourages Plaintiff to consult resources on Court's website, including the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules. Court also advises Plaintiff of her obligation to communicate and cooperate with counsel in an attempt to explore good faith resolution of issues.Ms. Benton reports parties have reached tentative settlement. Court directs parties to exchange targeted initial disclosures/discovery by 3/28/2022 to assist in resolution of liens and other issues. Parties to confer in good faith to attempt to finalize settlement.Court sets Telephone Conference for 5/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Enter Access Code 2070326. (ATT / 9:00 - 9:40 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE not held.Discussion had. Pro se Plaintiff reports making efforts to secure counsel. Court reminds Plaintiff of responsibilities as a pro se litigant, to comply with all court rules, orders and and deadlines. Court encourages Plaintiff to consult resources on Court's website, including the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules. Court also advises Plaintiff of her obligation to communicate and cooperate with counsel in an attempt to explore good faith resolution of issues.Ms. Benton reports parties have reached tentative settlement. Court directs parties to exchange targeted initial disclosures/discovery by 3/28/2022 to assist in resolution of liens and other issues. Parties to confer in good faith to attempt to finalize settlement.Court sets Telephone Conference for 5/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Enter Access Code 2070326. (ATT / 9:00 - 9:40 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EO: The Court is in receipt of pro se Plaintiff's #13 email dated 2/20/22, wherein she requests permission to appear telephonically. There are currently no hearings scheduled for this case before Judge Otake. Most hearings are currently conducted by zoom or telephone at this time. However, if a hearing is held in person, requests to appear remotely must be made per hearing. Requests to appear remotely before Magistrate Judge Trader must be presented to him. Plaintiff also includes other information in the email that the Court declines to address. Local Rule 81.1(f) prohibits pro se litigants from "informally communicat[ing] with the presiding judge or chambers staff by letter, telephone, or electronic means." Local Rule 81.1(f). Any "[r]equests for action must be brought by motion subject to response by the opposing party." Id. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Email to Judge Jill A. Otake from Plaintiff Michale Ellerman Re: Request for telephonic appearance, dated February 20, 2022. RESTRICTED to Court and Parties. (eta) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Scheduling Conference Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#11) EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 22-00035 JAO-RTM on all further pleadings. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Michale Ellerman shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 15, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [Re-submission of] Consent Election Form. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent Election Form (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent Election Form. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form ) YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. (FILING INSTRUCTIONS ATTACHED). While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date onwhich the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Michale Ellerman shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 24, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/28/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Michale Ellerman shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 24, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00035 RT on all further pleadings. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Michale Ellerman shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 24, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from District Court of the Fifth Circuit, case number 5DRC-21-0000876. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2633042), filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint) , #2 Exhibit B (Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Certificate of Service) , #3 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand) Modified on 1/21/2022 (eta). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn L.M. Benton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Normand R. Lezy