This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2019 at 07:43:16 (UTC).

Ellenberger v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Ellenberger filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Graham Mullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00230

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brellyn Ellenberger

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles A. Everage

1800 Camden Road, Ste. 104

Charlotte, NC 28216

Defendant Attorney

Julia Kay Wood

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

227 W. Trade St., Suite 1650

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: three (3) days. Discovery due by 1/3/2020. Motions due by 2/7/2020. Mediation deadline set for 1/17/2020. Bench Trial set for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/21/2019. (brl) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Wood, Julia) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America.(Wood, Julia) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(brj) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4026669), filed by Brellyn Ellenberger.(Everage, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: three (3) days. Discovery due by 1/3/2020. Motions due by 2/7/2020. Mediation deadline set for 1/17/2020. Bench Trial set for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/21/2019. (brl) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Wood, Julia) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 6/27/2019. (clc) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America.(Wood, Julia) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(brj) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4026669), filed by Brellyn Ellenberger.(Everage, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less