This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:44:50 (UTC).

Elizondo et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Elizondo filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CitiMortgage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00537

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Brenda Elizondo

Gabriel Elizondo

Defendants

Cenlar, FSB

CitiMortgage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason LeBoeuf

Attorney at Vilt and Associates, P.C.

2435 N. Central Expressway, Suite 1200

Richardson, TX 75080

Robert C. Vilt

Attorney at Vilt and Associates, P.C.

5177 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1230

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Frances Hayes

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

Benjamin David Lee Foster

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

600 Congress Ave., Ste. 2200

Austin, TX 78701

Robert T. Mowrey

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201-6766

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CitiMortgage, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12127906), filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A (state court file), #4 Exhibit B (property detail))(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #2

Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Gabriel Elizondo, Brenda Elizondo.(LeBoeuf, Jason) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit B (property detail)

1 #3

Exhibit A (state court file)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Gabriel Elizondo, Brenda Elizondo.(LeBoeuf, Jason) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CitiMortgage, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12127906), filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A (state court file), #4 Exhibit B (property detail))(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.