This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 09:12:49 (UTC).

Elizabeth Wong v. Michael F. Sitzer et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Elizabeth Wong filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Michael F Sitzer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01451

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth E Wong

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendants

Sitzer Law Group, P.C.

Michael Sitzer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan Christopher Borges

Attorney at Greenberg Gross LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorney

Ryan D Saba

Attorney at Rosen Saba LLP

9350 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 250

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#9

#11

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Receipt of acknowledgment Letter of Transmittal CV-103 (es) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Orange. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Orange. (es) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge James V. Selna. The Court sua sponte REMANDS this action to the California Superior Court for the County of Orange for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, as set forth below. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (es) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Michael Sitzer, Sitzer Law Group, P.C. (Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Withdrawal of Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Defendants Michael Sitzer, Sitzer Law Group, P.C.. (Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Sitzer Law Group, P.C. identifying Sitzer Law Group, P.C. as Corporate Parent. (Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Sitzer Law Group, P.C. identifying Sitzer Law Group, P.C. as Corporate Parent. (Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Michael Sitzer, Sitzer Law Group, P.C.. (Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2020-01145830 Receipt No: ACACDC-27519455 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Sitzer Law Group, P.C., Michael Sitzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Ryan D Saba added to party Michael Sitzer(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan D Saba added to party Sitzer Law Group, P.C.(pty:dft))(Saba, Ryan) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sitzer Law Group, P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Christopher Borges Esquire