Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2020 at 11:49:17 (UTC).

Elizabeth Gendron et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Elizabeth Gendron filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Toyota Motor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and William F. Kuntz, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02947

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elizabeth Gendron

Roger Carter

Defendants

Toyota Motor North America Inc.

Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.

Denso Corporation

Toyota Motor Corporation

Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.

Denso International America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Betsy C. Manifold

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

750 B Street, Suite 1820

San Diego, CA 92101

Brittany DeJong

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz LLP

750 B Street Suite 2770

San Diego, CA 92101

Rachele R Rickert

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz LLP

750 B Street Suite 2770

San Diego, CA 92101

Marisa C Livesay

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz LLP

750 B Street Suite 1820

San Diego, CA 92101

Kate Marietta McGuire

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

270 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10016

Malcolm T. Brown

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

270 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Brian Shortnacy

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Hooper

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Eric F. Gladbach

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas, 212-56-2206

New York, NY 10036

Jessica Kristen Shook

Attorney at King & Spalding

1185 6Th Avenue

New York, NY 10036

Jacquelene Anna Marcott

Attorney at Yukevich Cavanaugh

355 South Grand Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Raymond H Hua

Attorney at Yukevich Cavanaugh

355 South Grand Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Joshua Eli Abraham

Attorney at Joshua E. Abraham

477 Madison Avenue, Suite 1230, 10022

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Marietta McGuire on behalf of Elizabeth Gendron (aty to be noticed) (McGuire, Kate) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm T. Brown on behalf of Elizabeth Gendron (aty to be noticed) (Brown, Malcolm) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#37

(#37) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 9/21/2020 @ 3:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 3:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-2947. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/10/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#36

(#36) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Denso International America, Inc.. (Abraham, Joshua) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Betsy C Manifold on behalf of Plaintiffs Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron (Attorney Betsy C Manifold added to party Roger Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Betsy C Manifold added to party Elizabeth Gendron(pty:pla))(Manifold, Betsy) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron. (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#7

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron. (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron, (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#3

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron. (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2020)

1 #7

Declaration of Plaintiffs Elizabeth Gendron and Roger Carter Pursuant to Cal. Ci

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Marietta McGuire on behalf of Elizabeth Gendron (aty to be noticed) (McGuire, Kate) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm T. Brown on behalf of Elizabeth Gendron (aty to be noticed) (Brown, Malcolm) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 9/21/2020 @ 3:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 3:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-2947. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/10/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Denso Corporation answer due 8/27/2020; Denso International America, Inc. answer due 8/27/2020. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/22/2020. (Stykes, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Denso International America, Inc.. (Abraham, Joshua) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc. answer due 8/27/2020; Toyota Motor North America Inc. answer due 8/27/2020; Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. answer due 8/27/2020. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/21/2020. (Stykes, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint Until 8/27/2020 by Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Hooper, John) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kristen Shook on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shook, Jessica) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric F. Gladbach on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gladbach, Eric) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by John Hooper on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hooper, John) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Betsy C Manifold on behalf of Plaintiffs Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron (Attorney Betsy C Manifold added to party Roger Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Betsy C Manifold added to party Elizabeth Gendron(pty:pla))(Manifold, Betsy) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron. (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron, (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron. (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Roger Carter, Elizabeth Gendron. (Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26152927 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Gendron, Roger Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Declaration of Plaintiffs Elizabeth Gendron and Roger Carter Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Code 1780(d)) (Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Roger Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Elizabeth Gendron(pty:pla))(Byrd, Rachele) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Denso Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant