This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:47:11 (UTC).

Eliassaint v. Rooms To Go Central Corp.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Eliassaint filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Rooms To Go Central Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Jung and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03001

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelet Eliassaint

Defendant

Rooms To Go Central Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tiffani-Ruth Imani Brooks

Attorney at Derek Smith Law Group

701 Brickell Ave.

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rooms To Go Central Corp. with Jury Demand filed by Michelet Eliassaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) Modified on 12/6/2019 to correct docket text (SJB). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/6/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/7/2020 by Rooms To Go Central Corp. as to Rooms To Go Central Corp. (Harris, Phillip) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michelet Eliassaint. Related case(s): no (Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) RETURN of service executed on 12/17/2019 by Michelet Eliassaint as to Rooms To Go Central Corp. (Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Rooms To Go Central Corp. (LNR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Michelet Eliassaint. (Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/7/2020 by Rooms To Go Central Corp. as to Rooms To Go Central Corp. (Harris, Phillip) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Michelet Eliassaint. (Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michelet Eliassaint. Related case(s): no (Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 12/17/2019 by Michelet Eliassaint as to Rooms To Go Central Corp. (Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketFEES paid by Michelet Eliassaint (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number TPA059268) (ARC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Rooms To Go Central Corp. (LNR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/6/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-3001-T-02CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rooms To Go Central Corp. with Jury Demand filed by Michelet Eliassaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Tiffani-Ruth) Modified on 12/6/2019 to correct docket text (SJB). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less