This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2020 at 10:47:13 (UTC).

Eliason v. Shelby et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Eliason filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Shelby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip A. Brimmer and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00959

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brett L. Eliason

North Salt Lake City, UT 84054

Brett Lynn Eliason

North Salt Lake, UT 84054

Defendants

Robert J. Shelby

Dustin B. Pead

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE REGARDING AVAILABILITY OF PRO SE CLINIC AND AVAILABLE COURT RESOURCES. Issued by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/15/2020. (skclc2) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#15

(#15) Exhibits in Support OF RELATED UTAH CASE by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#13

(#13) First MOTION to Compel THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO DEFEND THE US CONSTITUTION by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#11

(#11) Second MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#9

(#9) First MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#7

(#7) First MOTION for Joinder of additional Defendants as described on the attached which includes The Corporation of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and The United States Department of Justice by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#5

(#5) First MOTION to Compel The Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (agarc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Request of Injunction against Dustin B. Pead, and Robert J. Shelby (Filing Fee: $400.00; Receipt Number: COX094689), filed by Brett L. Eliason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(agarc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #5 First Motion to Compel the President of the Church of Latter Day Saints; #9 First Motion for Summary Judgment; #11 Second Motion for Summary Judgment; #13 First Motion to Compel the United States. Discovery under Rule 26 as not commenced in this matter; indeed, the two Defendants in this matter, Robert J. Shelby and Dustin B. Pead, have been served or entered an appearance in this matter. Therefore, the Court finds that the relief sought by each of the four Motions referenced above is premature. The Court will entertain such Motions only after discovery begins in this matter. Thus, IT IS ORDERED these Motions are premature and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, for all future filings, the parties listed in the case caption shall include only the named parties in this case. As of the date of this Order, those are Plaintiff Brett L. Eliason, and Defendants Robert J. Shelby and Dustin B. Pead. [See, e.g., Docket No. #16 at p. 1.] SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/20/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE REGARDING AVAILABILITY OF PRO SE CLINIC AND AVAILABLE COURT RESOURCES. Issued by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/15/2020. (skclc2) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Exhibits in Support OF RELATED UTAH CASE by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM regarding #13 First MOTION to Compel THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO DEFEND THE US CONSTITUTION filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/11/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First MOTION to Compel THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO DEFEND THE US CONSTITUTION by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/5/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Second MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM regarding #9 First MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/29/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM regarding #7 First MOTION for Joinder of additional Defendants as described on the attached which includes The Corporation of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and The United States Department of Justice filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/29/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION for Joinder of additional Defendants as described on the attached which includes The Corporation of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and The United States Department of Justice by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM regarding #5 First MOTION to Compel The Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/23/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION to Compel The Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (agarc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Request of Injunction against Dustin B. Pead, and Robert J. Shelby (Filing Fee: $400.00; Receipt Number: COX094689), filed by Brett L. Eliason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(agarc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less