This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 09:24:11 (UTC).

Elias v. Loveland, City of et al

Case Summary

On March 30, 2022, Harris Elias (“Plaintiff”), self-represented filed a civil rights lawsuit against City of Loveland (“LPL”), Loveland Police Officer William Gates (“Officer Gates”), and Loveland Police Sergeant Antolina Hill (“Sergeant Hill”) (together, “Defendants”), represented by Jonathan Marshall Abramson and Yulia Nikolaevskaya of Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.,  seeking declaratory and injunctive relief with damages for the alleged violations of Plaintiff’s rights guaranteed by the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments to the Constitution of the United States and Article II, Section 7 of the Colorado Constitution. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the District of Colorado with Judges Lewis T. Babcock and Nina Y. Wang presiding. 

In the complaint Plaintiff alleged that, “The Loveland Police Department loves to brag about its DUI arrest numbers. They constantly point to their high DUI arrest statistics as proof that they need more funding, more officers, and more equipment. They are then, in fact, able to get more funding, more officers, and more equipment, as a result. As it happens, this is a scam. They have been padding their DUI arrest numbers by arresting and wrongfully charging innocent people with this horrific crime.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Loveland’s reckless pursuit of awards, money, and accolades for having the highest DUI arrest numbers has resulted in a culture at the department where it is an accepted pattern and practice to wrongfully arrest innocent citizens and charge them with DUIs. Harris Elias is one of the many victims of Loveland’s corrupt and self-serving scheme.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Plaintiff brings this civil rights action pursuant to § 13-21-131, C.R.S. and 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and 1988 for various forms of relief, to include compensatory damages and attorneys fees, stemming from Defendants’ violations of Plaintiff’s rights guaranteed by the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments to the Constitution of the United States and Article II, Section 7 of the Colorado Constitution.”

There are three claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim deals with the alleged unlawful arrest without probable cause and failure-to-supervise/train along with the alleged violation of due process under the Fourth Amendment. Gates allegedly caused Plaintiff to be arrested without probable cause or a warrant, and his false statements in his report caused Plaintiff to be wrongly subjected to criminal prosecution. 

The Second claim deals with the alleged arrest without probable cause in violation of the Colorado Constitution, Article II, Section 7 because Gates’s alleged wrongful arrest and humiliation of Mr. Elias caused him to experience extraordinary stress, expense, depression, terror and anxiety. 

The last claim deals with the alleged malicious prosecution of the due process violations under the Fourth Amendment, because Gates allegedly caused the criminal prosecution against Mr. Elias by falsifying and deliberately exaggerating the facts in his report in an effort to make it more likely to appear there had been probable cause for Mr. Elias’s arrest, and allegedly provided those documents to the District Attorney.

In the prayer for relief Plaintiff has requested the court for declaratory and injunctive relief, actual economic damages, compensatory damages including but not limited to those for past and future pecuniary and non-pecuniary losses and physical and mental pain. Plaintiff requested the issuance of an Order mandating appropriate equitable relief, including issuance of a formal written apology from each Defendant to Plaintiff, imposition of disciplinary action against appropriate employees of Loveland with pre- and post-judgement interest at the highest lawful rate. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00644

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Regina M. Rodriguez

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harris Elias

Defendants

Loveland, City of

William Gates

Antolina Hill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah Jay Schielke

Attorney at Life & Liberty Law Office

1209 Cleveland Avenue

Loveland, CO 80537

Defendant Attorneys

Yulia Nikolaevskaya

Attorney at Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Ptarmigan Place

Denver, CO 80209

Jonathan Marshall Abramson

Attorney at Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Ptarmigan Place

Denver, CO 80209

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants William Gates, Antolina Hill, Loveland, City of All parties do not consent.. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#16

(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint by Defendants William Gates, Loveland, City of. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harris Elias. Antolina Hill waiver sent on 3/31/2022, answer due 5/30/2022. (Schielke, Sarah) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

14 #1

Exhibit Amended Complaint with Redlined Changes

14 #14

Main Document

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand (filed with consent) against All Defendants, filed by Harris Elias.(Schielke, Sarah) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Jay Schielke on behalf of Harris EliasAttorney Sarah Jay Schielke added to party Harris Elias(pty:pla) (Schielke, Sarah) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against William Gates, Loveland, City of, filed by Harris Elias.(norlin, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Yulia Nikolaevskaya on behalf of William Gates, Loveland, City ofAttorney Yulia Nikolaevskaya added to party William Gates(pty:dft), Attorney Yulia Nikolaevskaya added to party Loveland, City of(pty:dft) (Nikolaevskaya, Yulia) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6-State Court Register of Actions

1 #5

Exhibit 5-State Court Case Status Order

1 #4

Exhibit 4-Waiver of Service-Gates

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Waiver of Service-City

1 #2

Exhibit 2-State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 5/6/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE REASSIGNED. pursuant to #18 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00644-RMR. (Text Only Entry). (alave, ) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants William Gates, Antolina Hill, Loveland, City of All parties do not consent.. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER: The City of Loveland and Officer William Gates' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (ECF 12) ("Motion") #16 is hereby GRANTED. Defendants City of Loveland's and Officer William Gates' responses to the Amended Complaint #12 are due 5/31/2022. In addition, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 10:30 AM is hereby RESET for 6/28/2022 at 10:00 AM. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 6/21/2022. The deadline for the Parties to file the Consent/Nonconsent form remains SET for 5/4/2022. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/11/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint by Defendants William Gates, Loveland, City of. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harris Elias. Antolina Hill waiver sent on 3/31/2022, answer due 5/30/2022. (Schielke, Sarah) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Harris Elias (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint with Redlined Changes)(Schielke, Sarah) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER: This action is before the court on the Amended Complaint and Jury Demand #12 . Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a), "[a] party... who files an amended pleading... with the consent of the opposing party shall file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading and shall attach as an exhibit a copy of the amended pleading which strikes through (e.g., strikes through) the text to be deleted and underlines (e.g., underlines) the text to be added." No such notice was filed by Plaintiff. Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a notice in compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a) on or before 4/4/2022. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/31/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand (filed with consent) against All Defendants, filed by Harris Elias.(Schielke, Sarah) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Jay Schielke on behalf of Harris EliasAttorney Sarah Jay Schielke added to party Harris Elias(pty:pla) (Schielke, Sarah) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants William Gates, Loveland, City of. William Gates answer due 4/12/2022; Loveland, City of answer due 4/12/2022. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 21 March 2022. Consent Form due by 5/4/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/25/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/16/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00644-NYW. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against William Gates, Loveland, City of, filed by Harris Elias.(norlin, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Yulia Nikolaevskaya on behalf of William Gates, Loveland, City ofAttorney Yulia Nikolaevskaya added to party William Gates(pty:dft), Attorney Yulia Nikolaevskaya added to party Loveland, City of(pty:dft) (Nikolaevskaya, Yulia) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William Gates, Loveland, City of from Larimer County District Court, Case Number 2022CV30006. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8364566), filed by William Gates, Loveland, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3-Waiver of Service-City, #4 Exhibit 4-Waiver of Service-Gates, #5 Exhibit 5-State Court Case Status Order, #6 Exhibit 6-State Court Register of Actions, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less