This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2021 at 12:32:14 (UTC).

Elias Muniz v. Kroger Co., et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Elias Muniz filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Kroger Co . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00706

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elias Muniz

Defendants

KROGER CO.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sandra Acosta Tello

Attorney at West Coast Employment Lawyers

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3325

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ronald Leonardo Zambrano

Attorney at West Coast Employment Lawyers

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3325

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Neama Rahmani

Attorney at West Coast Trial Lawyers APLC

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3325

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Abraham Escareno

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo

12800 Center Court Drive South Suite 2400

Cerritos, CA 90703

Nate J Kowalski

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo ALC

12800 Center Court Drive South Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 24, 2021. (cw) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant KROGER CO., re Notice (Other) #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 served on April 16, 2021. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by defendant KROGER CO.. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT in Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant KROGER CO. identifying Kroger Co. as Corporate Parent. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Dorothy D Roberts re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant KROGER CO.. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Defendant's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant KROGER CO., identifying Kroger Co.. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant KROGER CO.. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 24, 2021. (cw) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Kroger Co. Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 .(car) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Elias Muniz, upon Defendant Kroger Co. served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss Authorized Agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Kroger Co. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Elias Muniz. Filed in State Court on 2/26/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant KROGER CO., re Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #7 , Notice (Other) #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 served on April 16, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to the Clerk of the Superior Court and to Adverse Party re Removal of Action)(Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant KROGER CO., re Notice (Other) #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 served on April 16, 2021. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by defendant KROGER CO.. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT in Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant KROGER CO. identifying Kroger Co. as Corporate Parent. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Dorothy D Roberts re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant KROGER CO.. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant KROGER CO., identifying Kroger Co.. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant KROGER CO.. (Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01186338-CU-OE-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-31128117 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant KROGER CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Notice of Hearing of Case Management Conference) (Attorney Abraham Escareno added to party KROGER CO.(pty:dft))(Escareno, Abraham) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant