This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2020 at 07:30:01 (UTC).

Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC v. Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy J. Corrigan and Patricia D. Barksdale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01313

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC

Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems, LLC

Defendant

Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand & Sebolt

4940 Munson Street Nw, Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Patrick Walsh

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

Suite 3300, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Robert Eric Bilik

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

Suite 3300, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report and Conduct Case Management Conference by Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (Walsh, Sean) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified to edit text on 1/8/2020 (KKH). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (Walsh, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick Walsh on behalf of Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. (Walsh, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Eric Bilik on behalf of Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. (Bilik, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

6 #2

Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form

6 #1

Case Management Report form

#6

(#6) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (KKH) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (KKH) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Exemplary Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit A-US Patent No. 8,534,551 B2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16129265) filed by Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent No. 8,534,551 B2, #2 Exhibit B-Exemplary Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to #1 the complaint and joint motion for an extension of time to conduct the case management conference and file the case management report. The defendant must respond to #1 the complaint by February 7, 2020. The parties must conduct the case management conference and file the case management report by February 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia Barksdale on January 9, 2020. (ASL) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report and Conduct Case Management Conference by Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (Walsh, Sean) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified to edit text on 1/8/2020 (KKH). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The defendant must respond to the complaint by January 10, 2020. Signe by Magistrate Judge Patricia Barksdale on December 4, 2019.(ASL) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (Walsh, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick Walsh on behalf of Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. (Walsh, Sean) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Eric Bilik on behalf of Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. (Bilik, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.. (KKH) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (KKH) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-1313-J-32PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16129265) filed by Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent No. 8,534,551 B2, #2 Exhibit B-Exemplary Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electronic Receipts Delivery Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEAN PATRICK WALSH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Eric Bilik