This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2021 at 13:48:16 (UTC).

Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC v. Daimler Trucks North America LLC

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Daimler Trucks North America LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Graham Mullen, David Keesler and Robert J. Conrad, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David Keesler

Presiding Judges

Graham Mullen

Robert J. Conrad, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC

Defendant

Daimler Trucks North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albert P. Allan

Attorney at Allan Law Firm, PLLC

409 East Boulevard, Suite 201

Charlotte, NC 28203

Charles Austin Ginnings

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave, Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Edward R Nelson, III

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC

3131 West 7Th St., Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Timothy E Grochocinski

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave. Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Defendant Attorneys

Fiona A. Bell

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

600 Travis St., Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Lydia C. Raw

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

B. Trent Webb

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

Jennifer K. Van Zant

Attorney at Brooks, Pierce, McLendon, Humphrey & Leonard, LLP

P. O. Box 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420

Patrick A. Lujin

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Mary Jane Peal

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Blvd

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#26

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#8

#7

#25

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice to Charles Austin Ginnings: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/24/2021. (mga) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles Austin Ginnings for Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/17/21. (mga) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles Austin Ginnings Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5080252. by Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC. (Allan, Albert). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/6/2021. (brl) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice to Patrick A. Lujin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/18/2021. (mga) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Patrick Lujin for Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/11/21. (mga) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice to Mary Jane Peal: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/18/2021. (mga) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mary Jane Peal for Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/11/21. (mga) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice to Lydia C. Raw: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/18/2021. (mga) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Lydia C. Raw for Daimler Trucks North America LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/11/21. (mga) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice to Edward R. Nelson, III: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/27/2021. (mga) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Edward R. Nelson, III for Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/20/21. (mga) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC (Allan, Albert) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (tlj) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to David Keesler: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward R. Nelson, III Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4990129., #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy E. Grochocinski Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4990148. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Daimler Trucks North America LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy E. Grochocinski Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4990148. by Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC. (Allan, Albert) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edward R. Nelson, III Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4990129. by Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC. (Allan, Albert) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Daimler Trucks North America LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4989990), filed by Electrolysis Prevention Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1:US RE47,494 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2: Claim Chart)(Allan, Albert) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Daimler Trucks North America LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary J Peal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick A. Lujin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer B. Trent Webb