This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 06:32:28 (UTC).

Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. v. Anderson et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I B E W filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers, Sarah D. Morrison, Algenon L. Marbley and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05128

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Kimberly A. Jolson

Presiding Judges

Sarah D. Morrison

Algenon L. Marbley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.

Petitioner

Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp

Defendants

Luis A. Reyes

K. Jon Taylor

Christopher D. Pappas

Donald T. Misheff

Sandra Pianalto

James F. O'Neill III

Steven E. Strah

Steven J. Demetriou

FirstEnergy Corp.

Michael J. Anderson

Leslie M. Turner

Julia J. Johnson

Thomas N. Mitchell

James F. Pearson

Charles E. Jones

James F. O'Neil, III

Interested Party

City of Philadelphia Board of Pensions and Retirement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C Camillus

Attorney at MEYER WILSON CO., LPA

305 W. Nationwide Blvd.

Columbus, OH 43215

Alla Zayenchik

Attorney at Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Matthew Traylor

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Jeroen Van Kwawegen

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Petitioner Attorney

Donald W Davis, Jr

Attorney at Brennan Manna & Diamond

75 East Market Street

Akron, OH 44308

Defendant Attorneys

Marjorie P Duffy

325 John H. Mcconnell Blvd., Suite 600

Columbus, OH 43216

Geoffrey J. Ritts

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave.

Cleveland, OH 44114

Robert Stephen Faxon

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave

Cleveland, OH 44114

Daniel John Donnellon

Attorney at SEBALY SHILLITO + DYER

9100 West Chester Towne Centre Drive, Suite 210

West Chester, OH 45069

Ann H. MacDonald

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Barry S. Hyman

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Karen L Giffen

Attorney at Giffen & Kaminski LLC

1300 East Ninth Street, Suite 1600

Cleveland, OH 44114

Kerin Lyn Kaminski

Attorney at Giffen & Kaminski LLC

1717 East Ninth Street, Suite 2100

Cleveland, OH 44114

Elise H. Yu

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

James Alan Dyer

Attorney at Sebaly Shillito & Dyer - 3

1900 Kettering Tower

Dayton, OH 45423

Kayvan B. Sadeghi

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas, Suite 3000

New York, NY 10036

Jason J Mendro

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Carole Schwartz Rendon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Daniel Rubin Warren

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Douglas L. Shively

Attorney at BakerHostetler LLP

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#78

(#57) ORDER in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (177) Motion to Continue Final Fairness Hearing Date in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ. Fairness Hearing rescheduled for 8/4/2022 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, Room 331 before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/12/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#77

(#56) ORDER OF PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; GRANTING with modification (170) Motion for Settlement in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/9/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#169

(#55) AMENDED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO STAY granting 166 provided that this Order shall not be interpreted to stay the case presently before Judge Adams in the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/18/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#168

(#54) ORDER in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (166) Motion to Stay in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/11/20222. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

165 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

165 #29

Main Document

34 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

34 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

34 #27

Main Document

#7

#6

#4

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (177) Motion to Continue Final Fairness Hearing Date in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ. Fairness Hearing rescheduled for 8/4/2022 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, Room 331 before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/12/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER OF PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; GRANTING with modification (170) Motion for Settlement in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/9/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) AMENDED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO STAY granting 166 provided that this Order shall not be interpreted to stay the case presently before Judge Adams in the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/18/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (166) Motion to Stay in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/11/20222. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#53) NOTATION ORDER granting (73) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Hur in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (165) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Hur in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (52) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Hur in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (56) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Hur in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (36) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Hur in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; granting (29) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert K. Hur in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/11/2022. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8717944) of Robert K. Hur by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of George A. Stamboulidis. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/4/2022. (er) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8655242) of George A. Stamboulidis by Defendant Charles E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; denying as moot (145) Motion to Stay in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/17/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (cw) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThis entry is being made for statistical purposes only. (ECF #47 Notice). (jlk) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie P Duffy for Defendants Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia J. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner (Duffy, Marjorie) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Ritts for Defendants Michael J. Anderson, Steven J. Demetriou, FirstEnergy Corp., Julia J. Johnson, Donald T. Misheff, Thomas N. Mitchell, James F. O'Neil, III, Christopher D. Pappas, James F. Pearson, Sandra Pianalto, Luis A. Reyes, Steven E. Strah, K. Jon Taylor, Leslie M. Turner (Ritts, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion of the Institutional Investors to Consolidate Related Derivative Actions, Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel by Movant Massachusetts Laborer Pension Fund Derivatively on Behalf of FirstEnergy Corp. (Davis, Donald) Modified text and event pursuant to Order granting Motion to Consolidate on 11/16/2020 (jlk). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Plaintiff Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. of Motion to Intervene in Related NDOH Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Camillus, John) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Schwartz Rendon for Defendant Charles E. Jones (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-5020, 2:20-cv-4813, 2:20-cv-4598, 2:20-cv-4534, 2:20-cv-3785, and 2:20-cv-5237 are related. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Judge Sarah D. Morrison, and Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 10/8/2020. (kk2) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:20-cv-3785 and 2:20-cv-4534 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison & Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/6/2020. (kk2) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Camillus, John) Modified event on 11/16/2020 (jlk). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7681813), filed by Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Camillus, John) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W. is a litigant

Latest cases where FirstEnergy Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald W Davis, Jr