This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2020 at 13:39:44 (UTC).

Electric Torque Machines Incorporated v. MacroAir Technologies Incorporated

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Electric Torque Machines Incorporated filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MacroAir Technologies Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine and G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00436

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Deborah M Fine

G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Electric Torque Machines Incorporated

Defendant

MacroAir Technologies Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kimberly Irene Friday

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

Colin Matthew Proksel

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER /NOTICE directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 29, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/16/2020. (REK) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-436-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#6) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18010513. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-436-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electric Torque Machines Incorporated. (Proksel, Colin) (MCO) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18010513 filed by Electric Torque Machines Incorporated. (Proksel, Colin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MacroAir Technologies Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Matthew Proksel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Irene Friday